EP1355755 - CUTTING TOOL AND CUTTING INSERTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seco Tools AB 737 82 Fagersta / SE | [2007/49] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states SECO TOOLS AB S-737 82 Fagersta / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SVENSSON, Mikael Rosenlundsvägen 18 S-737 33 Fagersta / SE | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel Sandvik AB Intellectual Property 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Taquist, Lennart Sandvik AB, Intellectual Property 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 02734833.3 | 16.01.2002 | [2003/44] | WO2002SE00073 | Priority number, date | SE20010000211 | 26.01.2001 Original published format: SE 0100211 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02058871 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1355755 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1355755 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/20 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
B23C5/202 (EP,US);
B23C5/02 (KR);
B23C2200/0411 (EP,US);
B23C2200/125 (EP,US);
B23C2200/201 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1926 (EP,US);
Y10T407/23 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDWERKZEUG UND SCHNEIDEINSÄTZE | [2003/44] | English: | CUTTING TOOL AND CUTTING INSERTS | [2003/44] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE ET PIECES DE COUPE RAPPORTEES | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 04.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 02.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2007 | BE | 05.12.2007 | CH | 05.12.2007 | CY | 05.12.2007 | DK | 05.12.2007 | FI | 05.12.2007 | LI | 05.12.2007 | NL | 05.12.2007 | TR | 05.12.2007 | IE | 16.01.2008 | LU | 16.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | SE | 05.03.2008 | GR | 06.03.2008 | ES | 16.03.2008 | PT | 05.05.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CY | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
LU | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CY | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 05.12.2007 | |
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4632607 (PANTZAR GLENN G E [SE]); | [A]US4966500 (TSUJIMURA OSAMU [JP], et al); | [A]EP0457488 (ISCAR LTD [IL]); | [A]DE4411475 (WALTER AG [DE]); | [A]US5718540 (SATRAN AMIR [IL], et al) |