EP1423575 - APPARATUS FOR LAYING DECKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beerden, Erik William Vincent 8 Cowles Road Mosman, New South Wales 2088 / AU | For all designated states Conroy, David James 61 Penhurst Street Penhurst, New South Wales 2222 / AU | [2005/15] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Green, Andrew Witsend, 135 East View Drive Orangeville, NSW 2570 / AU | ||
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Green, Andrew Witsend, 135 East View Drive Orangeville, NSW 2570 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Green, Andrew Witsend, 135 East View Drive Orangeville, New South Wales2570 / AU | [2005/15] |
Former [2004/23] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton, et al Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Kensett, John Hinton, et al Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | ||
Former [2004/23] | Kensett, John Hinton, et al Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02734909.1 | 25.06.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002AU00822 | Priority number, date | AU2001PR06584 | 25.07.2001 Original published format: AU PR658401 | AU20020027730 | 27.03.2002 Original published format: AU 2773002 | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03010401 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423575 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1423575 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04F21/20, E04G21/18, E04F15/04 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
E04F21/22 (EP,US);
E04B5/12 (EP,US);
E04F15/04 (EP,US);
E04F2015/02083 (EP,US);
E04F2201/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERLEGEN VON BODENBELAG | [2009/33] | English: | APPARATUS FOR LAYING DECKING | [2004/23] | French: | APPAREIL DE POSE DE REVÊTEMENT DE SOL | [2009/33] |
Former [2004/23] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERLEGEN VON DECKENSCHALUNG | ||
Former [2004/23] | APPAREIL DE POSE DE TABLIER | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 24.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2005 | 30.06.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.2006 | 30.06.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2007 | 30.06.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2008 | 30.06.2009 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.2010 | BE | 17.02.2010 | CY | 17.02.2010 | DK | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | IT | 17.02.2010 | NL | 17.02.2010 | SE | 17.02.2010 | TR | 17.02.2010 | GR | 18.05.2010 | ES | 28.05.2010 | PT | 17.06.2010 | IE | 25.06.2010 | LU | 25.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
IE | 25.06.2010 | ||
LU | 25.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
IE | 25.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
IE | 25.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | ES | 28.05.2010 | |
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | ES | 28.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE202779 (J. HACKSTEIN) [Y] 2 * the whole document * [A] 12,13; | [A]GB868490 (TENTEST COMPANY LTD) [A] 10* figure 2 *; | [Y]US3257766 (BUTTERFIELD WALTER L, et al) [Y] 10 * figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]US3577694 (OMHOLT RAY E) [A] 1,3,4,7-13 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4223505 (KREBEL EDGAR A, et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,11-13 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 35 * * figures 1-3,6 * [Y] 2,10 | International search | [X]US4858399 (SALATO JR PETER A [US]); | [X]US4965980 (LEAVENS WESTON [US]); | [A]CA1290131 (CLASSEN MICKEY E J [CA]); | [X]AU5637594 (MUIR CARMEL ANNE, et al); | [X]AU661814B (LAURENCE JOHN HOWELL, et al); | [A]WO9525856 (MAYNE IND HOLDINGS PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO9618776 (HOWELL KAYLENE DIEDRE [AU], et al); | [XP]WO0171113 (GUSTAVSEN JAN ELLING [NO]); | [XP]AU5010101 (PROUD BRIAN) | by applicant | DE202779 | US3577694 | US4223505 |