EP1281048 - POTENTIAL ENERGY SURFACE SENSOR CHIP AND USE OF POTENTIAL ENERGY SURFACES ON A SENSOR CHIP AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING A SENSOR CHIP FROM BEING SOILED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONZELMANN, Uwe Schwalbenweg 14 71679 Asperg / DE | 02 /
SCHULZ, Torsten Ludwigstrasse 51 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [2003/06] | Application number, filing date | 02735048.7 | 17.04.2002 | [2003/06] | WO2002DE01424 | Priority number, date | DE2001118781 | 18.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10118781 | [2003/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02084226 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1281048 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/684 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
G01F1/6845 (EP,US);
G01F1/684 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORCHIP MIT POTENTIALFLÄCHEN BZW. VERWENDUNG VON POTENTIALFLÄCHEN AUF EINEM SENSORCHIP BZW. VERFAHREN ZUR VERMEIDUNG VON VERSCHMUTZUNGEN AUF EINEM SENSORCHIP | [2003/06] | English: | POTENTIAL ENERGY SURFACE SENSOR CHIP AND USE OF POTENTIAL ENERGY SURFACES ON A SENSOR CHIP AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING A SENSOR CHIP FROM BEING SOILED | [2003/06] | French: | PUCE DE DETECTEUR PRESENTANT DES SURFACES DE POTENTIEL, UTILISATION DE SURFACES DE POTENTIEL SUR UNE PUCE DE DETECTEUR ET PROCEDE POUR EVITER LA CONTAMINATION D'UNE PUCE DE DETECTEUR | [2003/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 04.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1031821 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 23; figures 1-10 *; | [DX]US4888988 (LEE KI W [US], et al) [DX] 1-3,5-11 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 61; figure 1 *; | [DA]US5705745 (TREUTLER CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5158801 (HOPSON JR PURNELL [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 8; figure 3 *; | [A]US4947688 (YAGAWARA SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 6 * * column 5, line 3 - line 13; figures 1,4 * |