EP1373513 - STREPTOCOCCUS PNEUMONIAE PROTEINS AND NUCLEIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiron SRL. Via Fiorentina, 1 53100 Siena / IT | For all designated states THE INSTITUTE FOR GENOMIC RESEARCH 9712 Medical Center Drive Rockville Maryland 20850 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Chiron SRL. Via Fiorentina, 1 53100 Siena / IT | ||
For all designated states THE INSTITUTE FOR GENOMIC RESEARCH 9712 Medical Center Drive Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASIGNANI, Vega Chiron S.p.A., Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | 02 /
TETTELIN, Hervé, The Institute for Genomic Res. 9712 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 03 /
FRASER, Claire, The Institute for Genomic Research 9712 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02735782.1 | 27.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002IB02163 | Priority number, date | GB20010007658 | 27.03.2001 Original published format: GB 0107658 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02077021 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1373513 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/3156 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROTEINE UND NUKLEINSÄUREN VON STREPTOCOCCUS PNEUMONIAE | [2004/01] | English: | STREPTOCOCCUS PNEUMONIAE PROTEINS AND NUCLEIC ACIDS | [2004/01] | French: | PROTEINES ET ACIDES NUCLEIQUES DE STREPTOCOCCUS PNEUMONIAE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 08.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/12] | 19.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/12] | Divisional application(s) | EP05075713.7 / EP1630230 | EP10179925.2 / EP2278008 | EP10179935.1 / EP2278009 | EP10179940.1 / EP2270175 | EP10179948.4 / EP2270176 | EP10179956.7 / EP2314697 | EP10179962.5 / EP2270177 | EP10179966.6 / EP2278010 | Request for further processing for: | 02.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9818931 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [X]WO0006738 (MICROBIAL TECHNICS LIMITED [GB], et al); |