EP1435347 - METHOD OF JOINING OXIDE SUPERCONDUCTOR AND OXIDE SUPERCONDUCTOR JOINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Superconductivity Technology Center, The Juridical Foundation 6th floor, Eishin Kaihatsu Building, 34-3, Shinbashi 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0004 / JP | [2008/01] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states International Superconductivity Technology Center, The Juridical Foundation 6th floor, Eishin Kaihatsu Building, 34-3, Shinbashi 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iida, Kazumasa c/o Superconductivity Res. Lab. Intern. Supercund. Tech. Ctr. 1-10-13,Shinonome Koto-ku, Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | 02 /
Yoshioka, Junko Superconductivity Res. Lab. Intern. Supercond. Tech. Ctr. 1-10-13, Shinonome Koto-ku, Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | 03 /
Sakai, Naomichi c/o Superconductivity Res. Lab. Intern. Supercond. Tech. Ctr. 1-10-13, Shinonome Koto-ku, Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | 04 /
Murakami, Masato c/o Superconductivity Res. Lab. Intern. Supercond. Tech. Ctr. 1-10-13, Shinonome Koto-ku, Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02736067.6 | 12.06.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002JP05836 | Priority number, date | JP20010197713 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001197713 | [2004/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03002483 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1435347 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1435347 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C04B37/00, C30B33/06, H01B3/00 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
C04B35/6262 (EP,US);
C04B37/00 (KR);
C04B35/4508 (EP,US);
C04B35/6268 (EP,US);
C04B37/005 (EP,US);
H10N60/0268 (EP,US);
H10N60/80 (EP,US);
B32B2315/02 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3205 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3282 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3291 (EP,US);
C04B2235/408 (EP,US);
C04B2235/80 (EP,US);
C04B2237/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE ZUM VERINDEN VON SUPRALEITERN UND EIN VERBUNDSUPRALEITER | [2004/28] | English: | METHOD OF JOINING OXIDE SUPERCONDUCTOR AND OXIDE SUPERCONDUCTOR JOINER | [2004/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE JONCTION D'OXYDE SUPRACONDUCTEUR ET CORPS A CET EFFET | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2003 | Translation filed | 25.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2003 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2008 | BE | 02.01.2008 | CH | 02.01.2008 | CY | 02.01.2008 | DK | 02.01.2008 | FI | 02.01.2008 | IT | 02.01.2008 | LI | 02.01.2008 | NL | 02.01.2008 | TR | 02.01.2008 | SE | 02.04.2008 | GR | 03.04.2008 | ES | 13.04.2008 | PT | 02.06.2008 | IE | 12.06.2008 | LU | 12.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
TR | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
IE | 12.06.2008 | ||
LU | 12.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
IE | 12.06.2008 | ||
LU | 12.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
IE | 12.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
IE | 12.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
IE | 12.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 02.01.2008 | |
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 02.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5439879 (SALAMA KAMEL [US], et al) | International search | [A]JPH01160877 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH01242473 (SHOWA DENKO KK); | [A]JPH038777 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [Y]JPH0316966 (DOWA MINING CO); | [Y]JPH04104970 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPH05279028 ; | [Y]JPH0717774 (RAILWAY TECHNICAL RES INST); | [Y]JPH1084141 (KOKUSAI CHODENDO SANGYO GIJUTS, et al); | [Y]US5786304 (KIMURA KEIICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2001114576 (DOWA MINING CO, et al) |