EP1387711 - FLUID CONNECTOR DEVICES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexell Therapeutics Inc. 9 Parker Irvine, CA 92618-1605 / US | [2004/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JULIAR, Rena 1016 Auburndale Street Corona, CA 92880 / US | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02736735.8 | 07.05.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002US14853 | Priority number, date | US20010289059P | 07.05.2001 Original published format: US 289059 P | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02089900 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1387711 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | 14.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/10, A61J1/00, A61M1/36 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
A61M39/10 (EP,US);
A61M1/0231 (EP,US);
A61J1/1406 (EP,US);
A61M1/3693 (EP,US);
A61M1/60 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0266 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSKONNEKTOREN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2004/07] | English: | FLUID CONNECTOR DEVICES AND METHODS OF USE | [2004/07] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE RACCORDEMENT POUR DES FLUIDES ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2004/07] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 27.02.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3955833 (SILBERT JEROME A) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 49; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4004586 (CHRISTENSEN JOHN G, et al) [X] 1-12,17-20 * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 12; figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [A]US4256106 (SHOOR BERNARD A) [A] 1,19* column 5, line 15 - line 35; figures 1A-C *; | [X]WO8806460 (HEMASCIENCE LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-8,13,15-20 * page 8, line 3 - line 7 * * page 9, line 14 - line 24 * * page 11, line 3 - line 14 * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP0966985 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0974330 (BRACCO INT BV [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract * |