EP1397841 - MONOBLOCK BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ovonic Battery Company, Inc. 1707 Northwood Dr. Troy, MI 48084 / US | [2010/47] |
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states OVONIC BATTERY COMPANY, INC. 1707 Northwood Dr. Troy, MI 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOW, Philippe 30100 Rock Creek Drive Southfield, MI 48076 / US | 02 /
OSGOOD, Anthony 885 Grace Avenue Rochester Hills, MI 48307 / US | 03 /
DHAR, Subhash, K. 1978 Long Lake Shores Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302 / US | 04 /
CORRIGAN, Dennis, A. 3793 Burkoff Troy, MI 48084 / US | 05 /
OVSHINSKY, Stanford, R. 2700 Squirrel Road Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304 / US | [2004/17] |
Former [2004/12] | 01 /
GOW, Philippe 30100 Rock Creek Drive Southfield, MI 48076 / US | ||
02 /
OSGOOD, Anthony 3544 Samuel Avenue Rochester Hills, MI 48309 / US | |||
03 /
DHAR, Subhash, K. 1978 Long Lake Shores Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302 / US | |||
04 /
CORRIGAN, Dennis, A. 3793 Burkoff Troy, MI 48084 / US | |||
05 /
OVSHINSKY, Stanford, R. 2700 Squirrel Road Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304 / US | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2004/12] | Balsters, Robert Novagraaf SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 02736792.9 | 14.05.2002 | [2004/12] | WO2002US15099 | Priority number, date | US20010861914 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: US 861914 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02095843 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1397841 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1397841 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/42, H01M6/46, H01M10/50, H01M2/12, H01M2/00, H01M2/04 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
H01M10/0413 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/647 (EP,US);
H01M10/6556 (EP,US);
H01M10/6557 (EP,US);
H01M10/6561 (EP,US);
H01M10/6567 (EP,US);
H01M10/6568 (EP,US);
H01M50/394 (EP,US);
H01M50/528 (EP,US);
H01M50/529 (EP,US);
H01M10/24 (EP,US);
H01M10/345 (EP,US);
H01M10/615 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
H01M50/114 (EP,US);
H01M50/566 (EP,US);
H01M6/42 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/12] | H01M2/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/26] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | MONOBLOCKBATTERIE | [2004/12] | English: | MONOBLOCK BATTERY | [2004/12] | French: | BATTERIE MONOBLOC | [2004/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 25.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0964460 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-24* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5344725 (IDE MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5356735 (MEADOWS CLARENCE A [US], et al); | [Y]US5492779 (RONNING JEFFREY J [US]); | [Y]US5906899 (NODA MUNEYOSHI [JP], et al); | [X]EP1059679 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) |