EP1399869 - SYSTEM ENABLEMENT OF AUTOMATIC FARE COLLECTION DEVICES USING A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cubic Corporation 9333 Balboa Avenue San Diego, CA 92186 / US | [2004/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDGREN, Robert 10348 La Duena Way San Diego, CA 92124 / US | 02 /
MISTRY, Pradip 11660 Ramsdell Court San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 03 /
MONK, Brian, T. 7555 La Jolla Boulevard La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 04 /
NOBLITT, Carl 29704 Via Naravilla Ct. Sun City, CA 92586 / US | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2004/13] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 02736851.3 | 14.05.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002US15328 | Priority number, date | US20010291064P | 14.05.2001 Original published format: US 291064 P | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02093307 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1399869 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06K5/00 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
G07F7/0866 (EP,US);
G06Q20/045 (EP,US);
G06Q20/363 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G07B15/00 (EP,US);
G07C9/23 (EP,US);
G07F17/42 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEMBEFÄHIGUNG AUTOMATISCHER BEFÖRDERUNGSGELDSAMMELEINRICHTUNGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES NETZWERKS | [2004/13] | English: | SYSTEM ENABLEMENT OF AUTOMATIC FARE COLLECTION DEVICES USING A NETWORK | [2004/13] | French: | SYSTEME D'ACTIVATION DE DISPOSITIFS DE DISTRIBUTION AUTOMATIQUE DES BILLETS VIA UN RESEAU | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.03.2011 | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/31] | 24.03.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 25.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL9301902 (NEDERLAND PTT) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 38 *; | [X]GB2317258 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-17 * page 16 - page 32; claim 1 *; | [X]US5969332 (UEDA MASAAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 2 - column 6 *; | [X]US6085976 (SEHR RICHARD P [US]) [X] 1-17 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 51 * * column 7, line 15 - column 10, line 21 *; | [X]WO0062260 (SWISSCOM AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 21 * * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 32 * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 6 *; | [PX]EP1103922 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [PX] 1-17 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0026] *; | [PA]WO0139055 (JUNG SANG WON [KR]) [PA] 1-17* abstract *; | [PX]GB2361570 (BRITISH AIRWAYS PLC [GB]) [PX] 1-17 * page 4 - page 14 * | International search | [A]US6032857 (KITAGAWA HIROKI [JP], et al); | [A]US6118860 (HILLSON ANDREW RAINES [CA], et al); | [A]US6085976 (SEHR RICHARD P [US]) |