EP1393432 - ELECTRON TUNNELING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Colorado 201 Regents Administrative Center, 3 SYS Boulder, CO 80309 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Colorado 201 Regents Administrative Center, 3 SYS Boulder, CO 80309 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELIASSON, Blake, J. 1780 Grape Ave. Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 02 /
MODDEL, Garret 450 Marine Street Boulder, CO 80302 / US | [2005/13] |
Former [2004/10] | 01 /
ELIASSON, Blake, J. 3161 Madison Ave. P-219 Boulder, CO 80303 / US | ||
02 /
MODDEL, Garret 450 Marine Street Boulder, CO 80302 / US | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02736870.3 | 17.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002US15417 | Priority number, date | US20010860988 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: US 860988 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02095920 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1393432 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02N6/00, H01L25/00, H01L31/09 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
H01L31/06 (EP,US);
H02S10/00 (KR);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01L31/035236 (EP,US);
H01L31/101 (EP,US);
H10N70/00 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONEN-TUNNEL-EINRICHTUNG | [2004/10] | English: | ELECTRON TUNNELING DEVICE | [2004/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF A PENETRATION D'ELECTRONS PAR EFFET TUNNEL | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/47] | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4442185 (SKOTHEIM TERJE [US]) [X] 1-26 * column 4, line 9 - column 17, line 44; figures 1-14 *; | [X]US5621222 (KIMURA MIKIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-9* column 5, line 45 - column 11, line 2; figures 8-15 *; | [X]US5796119 (SEABAUGH ALAN C [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 51 - column 7, line 35; figures 1-11 * | International search | [A]US4272641 (HANAK JOSEPH J); | [X]US4442185 (SKOTHEIM TERJE [US]); | [X]US5621222 (KIMURA MIKIHIRO [JP]); | [X]US5796119 (SEABAUGH ALAN C [US]); | [A]US6121541 (ARYA RAJEEWA R [US]) |