EP1392108 - VACUUM GROOMING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hair Patrol LLC 6910 South Yukon Way Littleton, CO 80128 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREIDELL, James, E. 6910 South Yukon Way Littleton, CO 80123 / US | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02737000.6 | 17.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002US15898 | Priority number, date | US20010291762P | 17.05.2001 Original published format: US 291762 P | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02091818 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1392108 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1392108 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K13/00 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
A01K13/002 (EP,US);
A01K13/00 (EP,US);
A01K13/001 (EP,US);
A47L9/06 (US);
A47L9/0606 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VACUUMSTRIEGELGERÄT | [2004/10] | English: | VACUUM GROOMING TOOL | [2004/10] | French: | OUTIL DE TOILETTAGE A ASPIRATION | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07018981.6 / EP1955590 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.10.2007 | BE | 17.10.2007 | CH | 17.10.2007 | CY | 17.10.2007 | DK | 17.10.2007 | FI | 17.10.2007 | LI | 17.10.2007 | NL | 17.10.2007 | TR | 17.10.2007 | SE | 17.01.2008 | GR | 18.01.2008 | ES | 28.01.2008 | PT | 17.03.2008 | LU | 17.05.2008 | IE | 19.05.2008 | IT | 31.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | [2012/22] |
Former [2011/13] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
BE | 17.10.2007 | ||
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CY | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
TR | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
LU | 17.05.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
IT | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
BE | 17.10.2007 | ||
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CY | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
TR | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
LU | 17.05.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
BE | 17.10.2007 | ||
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CY | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
LU | 17.05.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
BE | 17.10.2007 | ||
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CY | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
BE | 17.10.2007 | ||
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CY | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
FR | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
BE | 17.10.2007 | ||
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
FR | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
BE | 17.10.2007 | ||
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
BE | 17.10.2007 | ||
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
BE | 17.10.2007 | ||
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 17.10.2007 | |
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 17.10.2007 | |
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB283988 (BERNARD HANDFORD, et al) [X] 1-5,7,10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE497159 (INVENTIA PATENT VERWERT GES) [X] 1-5,7 * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]DE971687 (VORWERK & CO ELEKTROWERKE KG) [Y] 9 * figure 2 *; | [XY]US3965527 (GEORGE IVOR PROSSER) [X] 1,2,7,8 * figures 3-5 * [Y] 6,9,11-13; | [X]FR2583260 (CHOURAKI JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1-3,9,10* page 1, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [X]US5095853 (KRUGER JEAN J [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 1-9 *; | [X]US5655481 (TRAHAN WENDY [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * column 5, line 30 - line 42; figure 5 *; | [X]DE29715247U (MAIER OTTO [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5768747 (SMITH ARTHUR SHAWN DWIGHT [CA]) [X] 1,5 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US5870851 (SHOEMAKER DAVID G [US]) [Y] 6 * figure 13 *; | [Y]US5881462 (ROMANI R MARLENE [US]) [Y] 11-13 * column 5, paragraph 2; claims 10,13 *; | [Y]US5924202 (ROMANI R MARLENE [US]) [Y] 11-13 * claims 9-11,19 * |