EP1395249 - SOFT ELASTIC CAPSULES COMPRISING RITONAVIR AND/OR LOPINAVIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES CHAD 0377/AP6D-2 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US | ||
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories D377/AP6D 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-6050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETRICONI, Sergio Via Roma 10 I-00042 Anzio / IT | 02 /
BARBATO, Alessandro Via Acaia 24 I-00183 Rome / IT | 03 /
SCUPPA, Roberta Via Cagliari 53 I-04011 Aprilia (Latina) / IT | 04 /
SALEKI-GERHARDT, Azita 1113 Virginia Avenue Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | 05 /
URCH, Martin 6191 Oakmont Lane Gurnee, IL 60031-5351 / US | [2004/27] |
Former [2004/11] | 01 /
PETRICONI, Sergio Via Roma 10 I-00042 Anzio / IT | ||
02 /
BARBATO, Alessandro Via Acaia 24 I-00183 Rome / IT | |||
03 /
SCUPPA, Roberta Via Cagliari 53 I-04011 Aprilia (Latina) / IT | |||
04 /
SALEKI-GERHARDT, Azita 1113 Virginia Avenue Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | |||
05 /
URCH, Martin 5233-E Oscar Court Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/11] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02737019.6 | 21.05.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002US15955 | Priority number, date | US20010866285 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: US 866285 | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02096395 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395249 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K31/513, A61K31/427, A61P31/18 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
A61K31/513 (EP);
A61K31/427 (EP);
A61K9/4858 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/427, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEICHE ELASTISCHE KAPSELN ENTHALTEND RITONAVIR UND/ODER LOPINAVIR | [2004/11] | English: | SOFT ELASTIC CAPSULES COMPRISING RITONAVIR AND/OR LOPINAVIR | [2004/11] | French: | CAPSULES MOLLES ELASTIQUES CONTENANT DU RITONAVIR ET /OU DU LOPINAVIR | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 25.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/15] | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9822106 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1-28* the whole document *; | [DX]WO0004016 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [DX] 1-28 * page 15, paragraph 3 - page 17, line 3 *; | [X]WO0074677 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [DX]US6232333 (LIPARI JOHN [US], et al) [DX] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2001051721 (DICKMAN DANIEL A [US], et al) [PX] 1-28 * page 12, column R, paragraph 162 - page 13, column L, paragraph 166 * |