EP1377515 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WETTING A YARN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/02] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING WINDING MATERIAL WITH A FLUID | ||
[2004/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walcher, Martin Breite Strasse 16 88481 Balzheim / DE | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Volkmann GmbH Weeserweg 60 47804 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/02] | 01 /
WALCHER, Martin Breite Strasse 16 88481 Balzheim / DE | Representative(s) | Sroka, Peter-Christian, et al Bauer Wagner Pellengahr Sroka Patent- & Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Grüner Weg 1 52070 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Sroka, Peter-Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Dominikanerstrasse 37 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/02] | Sroka, Peter-Christian, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Dominikanerstrasse 37 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02737760.5 | 28.03.2002 | [2004/02] | WO2002DE01143 | Priority number, date | DE20011017063 | 05.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10117063 | [2004/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02081350 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1377515 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1377515 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65H71/00 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
B65H71/00 (EP);
B65H71/007 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, TR [2005/22] |
Former [2004/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEFEUCHTEN VON GARN | [2004/49] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WETTING A YARN | [2004/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR HUMIDIFIER UN FIL | [2004/49] |
Former [2004/02] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEHANDELN VON WICKELGUT MIT EINEM FLUID | ||
Former [2004/02] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING WINDING MATERIAL WITH A FLUID | ||
Former [2004/02] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR TRAITER UNE MATIERE A ENROULER AVEC UN FLUIDE | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 16.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.06.2005 | GB | 01.06.2005 | TR | 01.06.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/38] | GB | 01.06.2005 | |
TR | 01.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | GB | 01.06.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3281223 (SIMISON ALLEN L) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,13,19,21,23 * column 5, line 25 - line 65; figure -; claims 1,6 *; | [XA]US3933456 (ROBERSON CLETIS L) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-11,13-17,21,23 * column 5, line 43 - column 7, line 32; figures 4-6; claim - * [A] 18; | [X]US4478625 (GRUBKA LAWRENCE J [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10-13,21-24 * the whole document *; | [X]US4440557 (MORRISON MICHAEL W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,13,23 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2064604 (VALEO, et al) [X] 1,3,10-12,20 * the whole document *; | [X]CH125443 (GIESLER HENRI [CH]) [X] 1,10,11,19 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE802865 (DULKEN CHARLES F) [X] 1,3,10-12,20 * figure 1; claims 1-5,10 *; | [A]DE2148345 (BLEICHE AG); | [A]GB1119937 (ISAAC BRIERLEY BRASS FOUNDERS) |