EP1405236 - CONVERGENT COMMUNICATIONS PLATFORM AND METHOD FOR MOBILE AND ELECTRONIC COMMERCE IN A HETEROGENEOUS NETWORK ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Upaid Systems, Ltd. Trident Chambers, Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 146 Road Town, Tortola VG 1110 / VG | [2017/02] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Upaid Systems Ltd. 19, Rue de Teheran 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Prafulla, C. Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 02 /
ENUGA, Ashok Kumar Reddy Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 03 /
VAIDYA, Manohar Sitaram Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 04 /
KASTURI, Kalyan, Chakravarthy Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 05 /
GUPTA, Richa Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 06 /
MUNNANGI, Suresh Kumar Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 07 /
JAMPANA, Varma Laxmi Jahannadha Siva Kumar Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 08 /
UNDAVALLI, Prasad Naganlaneya Vara Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 09 /
NALLAJERLA, Kondal Rao Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 10 /
SISTLA, Krishna Mohan Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 11 /
GUDIPATI, Amba Prasad Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 12 /
NALLAGONDA, Bhanu Murthy Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 13 /
VELPURI, Surya Sekhar Lakshmi Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 14 /
KALLURI, Veerabhadra Rao Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 15 /
SUBHASHREE, Radhakrishnan Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 16 /
MOHAN KUMAR, Sundaram Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 17 /
GOPARAJU, Muralidhar Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 18 /
WALDAKAR, Raju Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 19 /
SANTOS, Fernando Manoel Alves Jr. Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 20 /
VELAGALA, Narendra Kumar Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 21 /
NAKKALA, Amil Kumar Reddy Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 22 /
TUMMALA, Anjayya Chowdary Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 23 /
KOMPELLA, Krishna Mohan Venkata Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 24 /
MACHIRAJU, Ravi Kiran Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 25 /
SEETAMSETTY, Srinivas Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 26 /
VOORADI, Gopal Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 27 /
BURUGULA, Sesh Kumar Venkata Hara Naga Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 28 /
VELURU, Ranganatham Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 29 /
VENKTA, Vishnu Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | 30 /
JOYCE, Simon James Upaid Systems, Ltd., 50 Rue de Paradis F-75010 Paris / FR | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/15] | 01 /
GUPTA, Prafulla, C. Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
ENUGA, Ashok Kumar Reddy Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
VAIDYA, Manohar Sitaram Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
KASTURI, Kalyan, Chakravarthy Upaid Systems, Ltd. 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
05 /
GUPTA, Richa Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
06 /
MUNNANGI, Suresh Kumar Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
07 /
JAMPANA, Varma Laxmi Jahannadha Siva Kumar Upaid Systems, Ltd.., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
08 /
UNDAVALLI, Prasad Naganlaneya Vara Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19 Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
09 /
NALLAJERLA, Kondal Rao Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
10 /
SISTLA, Krishna Mohan Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
11 /
GUDIPATI, Amba Prasad Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
12 /
NALLAGONDA, Bhanu Murthy Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
13 /
VELPURI, Surya Sekhar Lakshmi Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
14 /
KALLURI, Veerabhadra Rao Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
15 /
SUBHASHREE, Radhakrishnan Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
16 /
MOHAN KUMAR, Sundaram Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
17 /
GOPARAJU, Muralidhar Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
18 /
WALDAKAR, Raju Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
19 /
SANTOS, Fernando Manoel Alves Jr. Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
20 /
VELAGALA, Narendra Kumar Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
21 /
NAKKALA, Amil Kumar Reddy Upaid Systems, Ltd., 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
22 /
TUMMALA, Anjayya Chowdary Upaid Systems, Ltd, 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
23 /
KOMPELLA, Krishna Mohan Venkata Upaid Systems, Ltd, 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
24 /
MACHIRAJU, Ravi Kiran Upaid Systems, Ltd, 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
25 /
SEETAMSETTY, Srinivas Upaid Systems, Ltd, 19, Rue de Teheran 75008 Paris / FR | |||
26 /
VOORADI, Gopal Upaid Systems, Ltd, 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
27 /
BURUGULA, Sesh Kumar Venkata Hara Naga Upaid Systems, Ltd, 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
28 /
VELURU, Ranganatham Upaid Systems, Ltd, 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
29 /
VENKTA, Vishnu Upaid Systems, Ltd, 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
30 /
JOYCE, Simon James Upaid Systems, Ltd, 19, Rue de Teheran F-75008 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2004/15] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02738410.6 | 28.06.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002GB02997 | Priority number, date | US20010894890 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: US 894890 | US20020096912 | 14.03.2002 Original published format: US 96912 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03003704 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1405236 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
G06Q20/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/32 (US);
G06Q20/322 (EP,US);
G06Q20/363 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G06Q20/403 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q40/12 (EP,US);
G07F7/0866 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/68 (EP,US);
H04M15/8038 (EP,US);
H04M15/854 (EP,US);
H04M17/00 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0029 (EP,US);
H04W12/12 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0196 (EP,US);
H04M2215/32 (EP,US);
H04M2215/34 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7442 (EP,US);
H04M2215/8166 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13003 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1305 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13093 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13095 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13098 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13103 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13106 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13109 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1313 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13134 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1315 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13152 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1322 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1324 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13274 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13282 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1332 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13331 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1334 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13345 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13349 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13372 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONVERGENTE KOMMUNIKATIONSPLATTFORM UND MOBILES ELEKTRONISCHES HANDELSVERFAHREN IN EINER HETEROGENEN NETZWERKUMGEBUNG | [2004/15] | English: | CONVERGENT COMMUNICATIONS PLATFORM AND METHOD FOR MOBILE AND ELECTRONIC COMMERCE IN A HETEROGENEOUS NETWORK ENVIRONMENT | [2004/15] | French: | PLATE-FORM DE COMMUNICATION CONVERGENTE DE COMMERCE MOBILE ET ELECTRONIQUE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE RESEAU HETEROGENE | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 23.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/35] | 22.11.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.07.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/35] | Appeal following examination | 09.01.2014 | Appeal received No. T0945/14 | 01.04.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.07.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0056085 (STAR HOME GMBH [CH], et al); | [A]WO0111857 (ON POINT TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS IN [US]) [A] 1-111 * abstract *; | [X]DE19938201 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [X] 1-111 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1107198 (CITIBANK NA [US]) [X] 1-111 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0071] * * figure - *; | [X]WO0143390 (MARKPORT LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1-111 * page 7, line 1 - page 20, line 8 * * figure - * |