EP1446939 - A sytem and method for accessing ubiquitous resources in an intellegent environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/34] | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ACCESSING UBIQUITOUS RESOURCES IN AN INTELLIGENT ENVIRONMENT | ||
[2009/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2004/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUOMELA, Riku Hallituskatu 17 D 108 FIN-33200 Tampere / FI | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02738446.0 | 21.06.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002IB02320 | Priority number, date | US20010904295 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: US 904295 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03007588 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1446939 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446939 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04L12/28 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04Q9/00 (KR);
H04W4/029 (US);
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
H04B1/205 (EP,US);
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
H04L12/2809 (EP,US);
H04L12/282 (EP,US);
H04W4/33 (US);
G08C2201/93 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04W48/14 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/34] | H04N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | 14.01.2004 | LT | 14.01.2004 | LV | 14.01.2004 | MK | 14.01.2004 | RO | 14.01.2004 | SI | 14.01.2004 | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum zugreifen auf allgegenwärtige Betriebsmittel in einer intelligenten Umgebung | [2009/12] | English: | A sytem and method for accessing ubiquitous resources in an intellegent environment | [2009/12] | French: | Système et procédé d'acces à des dispositifs dispersés dans un environnement intelligent | [2009/12] |
Former [2004/34] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUGREIFEN AUF ALLGEGENWÄRTIGE BETRIEBSMITTEL IN EINER INTELLIGENTEN UMGEBUNG | ||
Former [2004/34] | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ACCESSING UBIQUITOUS RESOURCES IN AN INTELLIGENT ENVIRONMENT | ||
Former [2004/34] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ACCES A DES DISPOSITIFS DISPERSES DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT INTELLIGENT | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 19.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.08.2009 | BE | 05.08.2009 | CY | 05.08.2009 | DK | 05.08.2009 | FI | 05.08.2009 | IT | 05.08.2009 | NL | 05.08.2009 | SE | 05.08.2009 | TR | 05.08.2009 | GR | 06.11.2009 | ES | 16.11.2009 | PT | 05.12.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/37] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CY | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5410326 (GOLDSTEIN STEVEN W [US]) [Y] 1,6,16 * abstract * * column 14, line 56 - column 15, line 20 *; | [Y]WO0017738 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-42 * abstract * * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 22 *; | [Y]US6127941 (VAN RYZIN JOHN M [US]) [Y] 1,6,16 * abstract * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 57 * * column 6, line 4 - line 35 *; | [A]EP1045302 (NELES FIELD CONTROLS OY [FI]) [A] 1-42 * abstract * * column 9, line 14 - line 40 ** column 10, line 8 - line 46 *; | [A]US6198479 (HUMPLEMAN RICHARD JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * abstract * * column 13, line 66 - column 14, line 10 * * column 15, line 49 - column 16, line 67 *; | [Y]WO0120572 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-42 * abstract * * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 24 * | International search | [A]US6020881 (NAUGHTON PATRICK J [US], et al); | [A]US6104334 (ALLPORT DAVID E [US]); | [A]US6160551 (NAUGHTON PATRICK J [US], et al); | [A]US6208341 (VAN EE JAN [US], et al) |