EP1399382 - PRODUCTION OF HIGH-PURITY FLUORINE GAS AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING TRACE IMPURITIES IN HIGH-PURITY FLUORINE GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/13] | HIGH-PURITY FLUORINE GAS, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF, AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING TRACE IMPURITIES IN HIGH-PURITY FLUORINE GAS | ||
[2010/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2011/15] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORISU, Junichi, c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K. 5-1, Ogimachi, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0867 / JP | 02 /
ATOBE, Hitoshi, c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K. 5-1, Ogimachi, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0867 / JP | 03 /
HOSHINO, Yasuyuki, c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K. 5-1, Ogimachi, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0867 / JP | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2004/13] | Application number, filing date | 02738834.7 | 27.06.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002JP06519 | Priority number, date | JP20010199437 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001199437 | JP20010199731 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001199731 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03002454 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1399382 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399382 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C01B7/20, C01G53/08, G01N30/14, H01S3/225 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
G01N21/3504 (EP,KR,US);
C01B7/20 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/0303 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/09 (EP,KR,US);
H01S3/036 (EP,KR,US);
H01S3/225 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/13] | C01B7/20, C01G53/08, G01N30/14, G01N21/35, H01S3/225 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINES HOCHREINEN FLUORGASES UND METHODE ZUR ANALYSE VON SPUREN IN EINEM HOCHREINEN FLUORGAS | [2010/44] | English: | PRODUCTION OF HIGH-PURITY FLUORINE GAS AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING TRACE IMPURITIES IN HIGH-PURITY FLUORINE GAS | [2010/44] | French: | PRODUCTION DE FLUOR GAZEUX DE GRANDE PURETE ET ET PROCEDE D'ANALYSE D'IMPURETES A L'ETAT DE TRACES DANS DU FLUOR GAZEUX DE GRANDE PURETE | [2010/44] |
Former [2004/13] | HOCHREINES FLUORGAS, DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG UND METHODE ZUR ANALYSE VON SPUREN IN EINEM HOCHREINEN FLUORGAS | ||
Former [2004/13] | HIGH-PURITY FLUORINE GAS, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF, AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING TRACE IMPURITIES IN HIGH-PURITY FLUORINE GAS | ||
Former [2004/13] | FLUOR GAZEUX DE GRANDE PURETE, PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION DE CE DERNIER, ET PROCEDE D'ANALYSE D'IMPURETES A L'ETAT DE TRACES DANS DU FLUOR GAZEUX DE GRANDE PURETE | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2011 | BE | 13.04.2011 | CY | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | IT | 13.04.2011 | NL | 13.04.2011 | SE | 13.04.2011 | TR | 13.04.2011 | IE | 27.06.2011 | LU | 27.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | FR | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | ES | 24.07.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.06.2011 | ||
LU | 27.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 16.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2001007423 ; | [A]JPH07287001 ; | [XY]US3989808 (ASPREY LARNED B) [X] 1-9,12-14 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 25; claim . * [Y] 15-19; | [A]US4292287 (ORLETT MICHAEL J, et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2240639 (MAN TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 20-24 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 2, line 7 - line 22 * * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 19 * * page 5, line 8 - line 22 *; | [X]US5363396 (WEBB COLIN E [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,12-14 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 20; figure 1 * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE19618119 (LAMBDA PHYSIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 9,12 * abstract * * column 3, line 39 - line 46 *; | [DA]EP0902101 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [DA] 21,22* page 3, line 35 - page 5, line 8; example - *; | [Y]EP0957351 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [Y] 20-24 * column 1, line 7 - column 1, line 13 * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 45 * * column 9, line 12 - line 50 * * figure 3 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010508), vol. 2000, no. 16, & JP2001007423 A 20010112 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [Y] 15-19 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07287001 A 19951031 (KANTO DENKA KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract * |