EP1407048 - DETECTION OF SINGLE NUCLEOTIDE POLYMORPHISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xanthon, Inc. 104 Alexander Drive, Building 5, P.O. Box 12296 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Xanthon, Inc. 104 Alexander Drive, Building 5, P.O. Box 12296 Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKHARDT, Allen, E. 908 Kimball Drive Durham, NC 27705 / US | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al MEWBURN ELLIS, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02739511.0 | 31.05.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002US16993 | Priority number, date | US20010873809 | 04.06.2001 Original published format: US 873809 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02099137 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1407048 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/04 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2565/501, C12Q2563/113 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHWEIS VON EINZELNUKLEOTID-POLYMORPHISMEN | [2004/16] | English: | DETECTION OF SINGLE NUCLEOTIDE POLYMORPHISMS | [2004/16] | French: | DETECTION DE POLYMORPHISMES MONONUCLEOTIDIQUES | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/05] | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/05] | Request for further processing for: | 12.06.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.01.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | 09.01.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.01.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO9701646 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US], et al) [DX] 1-42 * pages 1-35; figures 1-8; examples 1-12; claims 1-30,80-151 *; | [X]US5968745 (THORP HOLDEN H [US], et al) [X] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0065099 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US], et al) [Y] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [X]US6221586 (BARTON JACQUELINE K [US], et al) [X] 1,22 * column 2 - column 9 *; | [Y] - THORP H H, "Cutting out the middleman: DNA biosensors based on electrochemical oxidation", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19980301), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 117 - 121, XP004108589 [Y] 1-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(97)01162-1 | [Y] - NAPIER MARY E ET AL, "Probing biomolecule recognition with electron transfer: Electrochemical sensors for DNA hybridization", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (199711), vol. 8, no. 6, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 906 - 913, XP002305927 [Y] 1-42 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5871918 (THORP HOLDEN H [US], et al); | [Y]US6127127 (ECKHARDT ALLEN E [US], et al); | [Y] - BOON E.M. ET AL., "Mutation detection by electrocatalysis at DNA-modified electrodes", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200010), vol. 18, pages 1096 - 1100, XP002956428 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/80301 |