EP1404851 - PRODUCTION OF PROTEINS IN PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Icon Genetics, Inc. Suite 134, 66 Witherspoon Street Princeton, NJ 08542 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Icon Genetics, Inc. Suite 134, 66 Witherspoon Street Princeton, NJ 08542 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALL, Gerald 142 Rice Drive Morrisville, PA 19067 / US | 02 /
BASCOMB, Newell 21 Ponds Circle Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | 03 /
BOSSIE, Mark 7 Pickering Drive Robbinsville, NJ 08691 / US | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02739726.4 | 07.06.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002US17927 | Priority number, date | US20010297103P | 08.06.2001 Original published format: US 297103 P | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02101006 | Date: | 19.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1404851 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/83, C12N15/14 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
C12N15/8216 (EP,US);
C12N15/8257 (EP,US);
C12N15/8258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROTEINPRODUKTION IN PFLANZEN | [2004/15] | English: | PRODUCTION OF PROTEINS IN PLANTS | [2004/15] | French: | PRODUCTION DE PROTEINES VEGETALES | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 25.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/01] | 02.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9831823 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [X] 4,5,7-9,15,16,21-25,28-30,32-37,40,43,49,52 * page 78, paragraph 2 - page 80; figures 9,11 *; | [A]WO0026371 (MONSANTO CO [US], et al) [A] * page 27, paragraph 4.5.6 *; | [X]WO0037609 (THOMPSON BOYCE PLANT RES [US], et al) [X] 2,4,7-9,14,21-25,29-37,40-43,49-52 * figure 15; example 22 *; | [DX]WO0078985 (METS OLIX INC [US]) [DX] 2,4,7-10,12-17,21-26,28-43,49-52 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0129242 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [X] 4-9,14-25,28-43,49-52 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO9854342 (ATABEKOV JOSEPH [RU], et al); | [Y]WO9855636 (ATABEKOV JOSEPH [RU], et al); | [Y] - TOTH ET AL., "A novel strategy for the expression of foreign genes from plant virus vectors", FEBS LETTERS, (2001), vol. 489, pages 215 - 219, XP004248888 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(01)02091-9 | [Y] - SKULACHEV ET AL., "Internal initiation of translation directed by the 5'-untranslated region of the tobamovirus subgenomic RNA 12", VIROLOGY, (1999), vol. 263, pages 139 - 154, XP002150885 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1999.9928 | [Y] - URWIN ET AL., "Functional characterization of the EMCV IRES in plants", PLANT JOURNAL, (2000), vol. 24, no. 5, pages 583 - 589, XP002182113 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313x.2000.00904.x | [Y] - BASSO ET AL., "Evidence for an internal ribosome entry site within the 5' non-translated region of turnip mosaic potyvirus RNA", J. GENERAL VIROLOGY, (1994), vol. 75, no. 11, pages 3157 - 3165, XP000918191 |