EP1420744 - AMINE COMPOUNDS AND CURABLE COMPOSITIONS DERIVED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIRGINIA TECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIES, INC. 1872 Pratt Drive Suite 1625 Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Virginia Tech Intellectual Properties, Inc. 1872 Pratt Drive, Suite 1625 Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILKES, Garth, L. 3345 Laurel Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | 02 /
LI, Chenghong 2401 Brewer Drive Rolla, Missouri 65401 / US | [2004/27] |
Former [2004/22] | 01 /
WILKES, Garth, L. 3345 Laurel Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | ||
02 /
LI, Chenghong 405-C Mill Creek Court Wilmington, NC 28403 / US | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2004/22] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02739822.1 | 11.06.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002US18433 | Priority number, date | US20010896082 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: US 896082 | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03002057 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1420744 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/00, C09D4/00 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
C08G59/504 (EP,US);
C07F7/10 (KR);
C08G59/306 (EP,US);
C08G59/3254 (EP,US);
C08G59/50 (EP,US);
C08G77/54 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/22] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMINEVERBINDUNGEN UND DARAUS ERHALTENE HÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2004/22] | English: | AMINE COMPOUNDS AND CURABLE COMPOSITIONS DERIVED THEREFROM | [2004/22] | French: | COMPOSES AMINES ET COMPOSITIONS DURCISSABLES DERIVEES DESDITS COMPOSES | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 12.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 09.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0570173 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1-21 * page 5, line 43 - page 6, line 6; example -; table I *; | [A]DE19840009 (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* column 2, line 65 - line 66; example -; claim - * | International search | [A]US2946701 (PLUEDDEMANN EDWIN P); | [A]US3247280 (BERNARD KANNER); | [A]US6072018 (WILKES GARTH L [US], et al) |