EP1383940 - FUNCTIONAL CERAMIC LAYERS BASED ON A SUPPORT LAYER PRODUCED WITH CRYSTALLINE NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITN NANOVATION GMBH Untertürkheimer Strasse 25 66117 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states ItN Nanovation GmbH Untertürkheimer Strasse 25 66117 Saarbrücken / DE | ||
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states ItN-Nanovation GmbH Untertürkheimer Strasse 25 66117 Saarbrücken / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NONNINGER, Ralph Rosenstrasse 12 66129 Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
BINKLE, Olaf Blieskastelerstr. 20 D-66459 Kirkel / DE | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02740265.0 | 19.04.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002DE01453 | Priority number, date | DE2001119538 | 21.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10119538 | [2004/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02086194 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1383940 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1383940 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23C24/08, C23C30/00, C03C17/00, C04B41/87 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C03C17/007 (EP,US);
C03C17/22 (EP,US);
C04B41/4582 (EP,US);
C04B41/81 (EP,US);
C23C24/08 (EP,US);
C03C2217/425 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12611 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/00 (US,EP);
C04B41/4582, C04B41/4539, C04B41/4549, C04B41/5025 (EP,US);
C04B41/4582, C04B41/4539, C04B41/4549, C04B41/5027 (US,EP);
C04B41/4582, C04B41/4539, C04B41/4549, C04B41/5042 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKTIONELLE KERAMISCHE SCHICHTEN, AUF BASIS EINER, MIT KRISTALLINEN NANOTEILCHEN HERGESTELLTEN TRÄGERSCHICHT | [2004/05] | English: | FUNCTIONAL CERAMIC LAYERS BASED ON A SUPPORT LAYER PRODUCED WITH CRYSTALLINE NANOPARTICLES | [2004/05] | French: | COUCHES CERAMIQUES FONCTIONNELLES COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE SUPPORT PRODUITE AU MOYEN DE NANOPARTICULES CRISTALLINES | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 19.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.03.2005 | IE | 23.03.2005 | IT | 23.03.2005 | TR | 23.03.2005 | CY | 19.04.2005 | LU | 19.04.2005 | BE | 30.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | DK | 23.06.2005 | GR | 23.06.2005 | SE | 23.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/38] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
IT | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
CY | 19.04.2005 | ||
LU | 19.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
CY | 19.04.2005 | ||
LU | 19.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
CY | 19.04.2005 | ||
LU | 19.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
CY | 19.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 23.05.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 23.05.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 23.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4303554 (SUDO RYOICHI, et al); | [A]JPH05131149 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JPH08270639 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]WO9950203 (UNIV WM MARSH RICE [US], et al); | [A]US6086948 (ROTH BARBARA [DE], et al); | [AD] - M.C. CAROTTA, M. FERRONI, V. GUIDI, G. MARTINELLI, "Preparation and Characterization of Nanostructured Titania Thick Films", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (1999), vol. 11, no. 11, pages 943 - 946, XP002234864 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4095(199908)11:11<943::AID-ADMA943>3.3.CO;2-C |