EP1381750 - DRILLING SYSTEM WITH EXPANDABLE SLEEVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DIJK, Robert, Albertus Utrechtseweg 310 6812 AR Arnhem / NL | [2004/04] | Application number, filing date | 02740555.4 | 26.04.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002EP04852 | Priority number, date | EP20010303847 | 27.04.2001 Original published format: EP 01303847 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02088510 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1381750 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1381750 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/20, E21B43/10, E21B47/10, E21B33/134 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
E21B7/20 (EP,US);
E21B33/134 (EP,US);
E21B43/103 (EP,US);
E21B47/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/04] |
Former [2004/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOHRVORRICHTUNG MIT EXPANDIERBARER HÜLSE | [2004/04] | English: | DRILLING SYSTEM WITH EXPANDABLE SLEEVE | [2004/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PERFORATION A MANCHON EXTENSIBLE | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 16.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 01.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 01.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US341327 (FAY) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US1380182 (BIGELOW ROBERT J) [A] 1,11* the whole document *; | [XY]US1981525 (PRICE BAILEY E) [X] 1,11 * page 3, line 3 - line 35; figure - * * page 4, line 43 - line 75 * * page 5, line 20 - line 36 * [Y] 2-10; | [A]EP0360319 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [Y]US5613557 (BLOUNT CURTIS G [US], et al) [Y] 2-10 * column 5, line 43 - line 49; figure - * * column 7, line 34 - line 44 *; | [A]EP0899420 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1,11 * abstract * |