EP1389201 - N-OXIDE ANTHRANYLAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS MEDICAMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma AG Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Müllerstrasse 178 13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERNST, Alexander Gellertpark 7 CH-4052 Basel / CH | 02 /
HUTH, Andreas Eichenbuschallee 1 12437 Berlin / DE | 03 /
KRÜGER, Martin Heerufer Weg 7a 13465 Berlin / DE | 04 /
THIERAUCH, Karl-Heinz Hochwildpfad 45 14469 Berlin / DE | 05 /
MENRAD, Andreas Allerstrasse 7 16515 Oranienburg / DE | 06 /
HABEREY, Martin Steinstr. 1 12169 Berlin / DE | [2004/18] |
Former [2004/08] | 01 /
ERNST, Alexander Ansbacher Str. 60 10777 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
HUTH, Andreas Eichenbuschallee 1 12437 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
KRÜGER, Martin Heerufer Weg 7a 13465 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
THIERAUCH, Karl-Heinz Hochwildpfad 45 14469 Berlin / DE | |||
05 /
MENRAD, Andreas Allerstrasse 7 16515 Oranienburg / DE | |||
06 /
HABEREY, Martin Steinstr. 1 12169 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 02740563.8 | 03.05.2002 | [2004/08] | WO2002EP04923 | Priority number, date | DE2001123573 | 08.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10123573 | DE2001125293 | 15.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10125293 | [2004/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02090349 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1389201 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D213/89, A61K31/47, A61P35/00 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
C07D213/89 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | N-OXIDANTHRANYLAMID-DERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL | [2004/08] | English: | N-OXIDE ANTHRANYLAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS MEDICAMENTS | [2004/08] | French: | DERIVES DE N-OXYDE ANTHRANYLAMIDE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QUE PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2004/08] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/08] | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 28.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO0027819 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [XD] 2-12 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO0027820 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 2-12 * claim 1 *; | [PX]WO0185671 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [PX] 2-12 * claims 1-13 * |