EP1390751 - DEVICE FOR PRESENTING POLYPEPTIDES, ABLE TO BE USED AS A CHIP FOR MINIATURISED DETECTION OF MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE LILLE II 42, rue Paul-Duez 59800 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE LILLE II 42, rue Paul-Duez 59800 Lille / FR | |||
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR DE LILLE 1, rue du Professeur Calmette 59000 Lille / FR | |||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE LILLE II 42, rue Paul-Duez 59800 Lille / FR | |||
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Societe d'Etude et de Developpement des Antigenes, Combinatoires - Sedac Therapeutics Parc Eurasanté, Le Galénis, Bâtiment B, 85, rue Nelson Mandela 59120 Loos / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR DE LILLE 1, rue du Professeur-Calmette 59000 Lille / FR | |||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE LILLE II 42, Rue Paul-Duez 59800 Lille / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELNYK, Oleg 1, rue du Professeur Calmette F-59000 Lille / FR | 02 /
GRAS-MASSE, Hélène 1, rue du Professeur Calmette F-59000 Lille / FR | 03 /
OLIVIER, Christophe 1, rue du professeur Calmette F-59000 Lille / FR | 04 /
DURAND, Jean-Olivier 1, rue du Professeur Calmette F-59000 Lille / FR | 05 /
AURIAULT, Claude 1, rue du Professeur Calmette F-59000 Lille / FR | 06 /
DUBURCQ, Xavier 1, rue du Professeur Calmette F-59000 Lille / FR | 07 /
BOUZIDI, Ahmed 1, rue du Professeur Calmette F-59000 Lille / FR | 08 /
GARCIA, Jean-Michel 14, rue de la Tranquillité F-59800 Lille / FR | 09 /
EL-MAHDI, Ouafâa 21, rue Jeanne Maillotte, Appt. 83 F-59800 Lille / FR | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/03] | Ramey, Daniel, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/35] | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/07] | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/09] | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al Armengaud Jeune Cabinet Lepeudry 43, rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02740818.6 | 27.05.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002FR01771 | Priority number, date | FR20010006931 | 28.05.2001 Original published format: FR 0106931 | [2004/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02097442 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1390751 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1390751 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/68 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
G01N33/54353 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR POLYPEPTIDPRÄSENTATION, VERWENDBAR ALS SENSORCHIP ZUR MINIATURISIERTEN DETEKTION VON MOLEKÜLEN | [2007/30] | English: | DEVICE FOR PRESENTING POLYPEPTIDES, ABLE TO BE USED AS A CHIP FOR MINIATURISED DETECTION OF MOLECULES | [2004/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRESENTATION DE POLYPEPTIDES, UTILISABLE COMME "PUCE" POUR LA DETECTION MINIATURISEE DE MOLECULES. | [2004/09] |
Former [2004/09] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR POLYPEPTIDPRÄSENTATION, VERWENDBAR ALS SENSORCHIP FÜR MOLEKULMINIATURISIERTEMESSUNG | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.2011 | CY | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | IE | 30.11.2011 | IT | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | TR | 30.11.2011 | GR | 01.03.2012 | ES | 11.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | GB | 27.05.2012 | LU | 27.05.2012 | BE | 31.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 27.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 27.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 27.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 27.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 27.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 30.11.2011 | |
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 30.11.2011 | |
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9312076 (CORVAS INT INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5849480 (CROS PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5877278 (ZUCKERMANN RONALD N [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0036419 (EXIQON A S [DK], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO0109385 (EPOCH PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |