EP1401400 - POROUS MATRIX COMPRISING CROSS-LINKED PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Nottingham Lenton Lodge, University Park Nottingham NG7 2RD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF NOTTINGHAM Lenton Lodge, University Park Nottingham NG7 2RD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAKESHEFF, Kevin Morris, Tissue Engineering Group School of Pharm. Sciences, The Uni. of Nottingham University Park, Nottingham NG7 2RD / GB | 02 /
SALEM, Ali Karimjee, Tissue Engineering Group School of Pharm. Sciences, The Uni. of Nottingham University Park, Nottingham NG7 2RD / GB | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Jennifer, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Atkinson, Jennifer, et al Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2004/14] | Heaton, Joanne Marie Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02740887.1 | 21.06.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002GB02813 | Priority number, date | GB20010015320 | 22.06.2001 Original published format: GB 0115320 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03000234 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1401400 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61L27/56 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K9/5153 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61K9/1647 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORÖSE MATRIX, AUS VERNETZTEN PARTIKELN BESTEHEND | [2004/14] | English: | POROUS MATRIX COMPRISING CROSS-LINKED PARTICLES | [2004/14] | French: | MATRICE POREUSE CONTENANT DES PARTICULES RETICULEES | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/28] | 31.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/28] | 25.02.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   11.07.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO0207707 (PERICOR SCIENCE INC [US]) [PX] 1-16,19-21,27 * page 9, line 11 - line 25 * * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 2 * * page 12, line 1 - line 21 * * page 71, line 29 - page 72, line 2 *; | [X]US5690954 (ILLUM LISBETH [GB]) [X] 1-13,16 * column 6, line 14 - line 26 * * column 7, lines 7-20,44-54 * * column 8, line 38 - line 53 * * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 52 *; | [X]WO9911196 (POINT BIOMEDICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 14 * * page 4, line 14 - line 22 * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 10 * * page 5, line 25 - line 35 * * page 9, line 12 - line 25 * * claim - *; | [X]US5714589 (OPPERMANN HERMANN [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 5, line 18 - line 31 * * column 11, line 30 - line 63 * * column 46, line 40 - line 64 *; | [A] - LAVELLE E C ET AL, "The stability and immunogenicity of a protein antigen encapsulated in biodegradable microparticles based on blends of lactide polymers and polyethylene glycol", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (199902), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 512 - 529, XP004153808 [A] 1-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(98)00229-1 | Examination | US5776193 | EP0221772 |