EP1404676 - PYRROLOPYRIMIDINES AS PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Somerset Corporate Boulevard Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 300 Somerset Corporate Boulevard Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COX, Paul Joseph 238 Skyline Drive Millington, NJ 07946 / US | 02 /
MAJID, Tahir Nadeem 77 Park Avenue 1511 Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US | 03 /
AMENDOLA, Shelley 271 Thistle Lane Bedminster, NJ 07921 / US | 04 /
DEPRETS, Stephanie Daniele 43 Ford Avenue, Unit 9 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 05 /
EDLIN, Chris 19 Garden Row Hitchin, Herts SG5 1QD / GB | 06 /
PEDGRIFT, Brian Leslie, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | 07 /
HALLEY, Frank, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | 08 /
EDWARDS, Michael, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | 09 /
BAUDOIN, Bernard, Aventis Pharma Limited Adventis House 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | 10 /
McLAY, Iain McFarlane 9, Sutton Close Loughton, Essex IG 10 3DP / GB | 11 /
ALDOUS, Davis John, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | [2013/24] |
Former [2007/32] | 01 /
COX, Paul Joseph 238 Skyline Drive Millington, NJ 07946 / US | ||
02 /
MAJID, Tahir Nadeem 77 Park Avenue 1511 Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US | |||
03 /
AMENDOLA, Shelley 271 Thistle Lane Bedminster, NJ 07921 / US | |||
04 /
DEPRETS, Stephanie Daniele 43 Ford Avenue, Unit 9 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | |||
05 /
EDLIN, Chris 19 Garden Row Hitchin, Herts SG5 1QD / GB | |||
06 /
PEDGRIFT, Brian Leslie, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
07 /
HALLEY, Frank, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
08 /
EDWARDS, Michael, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
09 /
BAUDOIN, Bernard, Aventis Pharma Limited Adventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Mall ing, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
10 /
McLAY, Iain McFarlane 9, Sutton Close Loughton, Essex IG 10 3DP / GB | |||
11 /
ALDOUS, Davis John, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
Former [2004/20] | 01 /
COX, Paul Joseph 238 Skyline Drive Millington, NJ 07946 / US | ||
02 /
MAJID, Tahir Nadeem 77 Park Avenue #1511 Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US | |||
03 /
AMENDOLA, Shelley 271 Thistle Lane Bedminster, NJ 07921 / US | |||
04 /
DEPRETS, Stephanie Daniele 43 Ford Avenue, Unit 9 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | |||
05 /
EDLIN, Chris 19 Garden Row Hitchin, Herts SG5 1QD / GB | |||
06 /
PEDGRIFT, Brian Leslie, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
07 /
HALLEY, Frank, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
08 /
EDWARDS, Michael, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
09 /
BAUDOIN, Bernard, Aventis Pharma Limited Adventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Mall ing, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
10 /
McLAY, Iain McFarlane 9, Sutton Close Loughton, Essex IG 10 3DP / GB | |||
11 /
ALDOUS, Davis John, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
Former [2004/15] | 01 /
COX, Paul Joseph, Aventis Pharma Ltd. Aventis Hous, 50 Kings Hill Avenue West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | ||
02 /
MAJID, Tahir Nadeem, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill, West Malling, Kent ME 19 4AH / GB | |||
03 /
AMENDOLA, Shelley 271 Thistle Lane Bedminster, NJ 07921 / US | |||
04 /
DEPRETS, Stephanie Daniele, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
05 /
EDLIN, Chris, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
06 /
PEDGRIFT, Brian Leslie, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
07 /
HALLEY, Frank, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
08 /
EDWARDS, Michael, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
09 /
BAUDOIN, Bernard, Aventis Pharma Limited Adventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Mall ing, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | |||
10 /
McLAY, Iain McFarlane 9, Sutton Close Loughton, Essex IG 10 3DP / GB | |||
11 /
ALDOUS, Davis John, Aventis Pharma Limited Aventis House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4AH / GB | Representative(s) | Then, Johann Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Global Intellectual Property Department Industriepark Höchst Gebäude K 703 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Then, Johann, Dr. Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 02740895.4 | 21.06.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002GB02835 | Priority number, date | GB20010015393 | 23.06.2001 Original published format: GB 0115393 | US20010301678P | 28.06.2001 Original published format: US 301678 P | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03000695 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1404676 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/505, A61P29/00 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRROLOPYRIMIDINE ALS PROTEINKINASEHEMMER | [2004/15] | English: | PYRROLOPYRIMIDINES AS PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS | [2004/15] | French: | PYRROLOPYRIMIDINES UTILISEES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DES PROTEINES KINASES | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 08.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9823613 (PFIZER [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * claims 1-27 *; | [Y]WO9965908 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * claims 1-12 *; | [Y]WO9965909 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * claims 1-10 *; | [Y]WO0017202 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-25 * claims 1-45 *; | [Y]US6140317 (TRAXLER PETER [CH], et al) [Y] 1-25 * claims 1-13 *; | [Y]WO0142246 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * claims 1-26 *; | [A] - D. BERGSTROM ET AL., "Palladium-mediated synthesis of C-5 pyrimidine nucleoside thioethers from disulfides and mercurinucleosides", J. ORG. CHEM., (1991), vol. 56, no. 19, pages 5598 - 5602, XP002214295 [A] 1-25 * Scheme III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00019a025 |