EP1529495 - RESECTOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya,Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states Olympus Optical Co., Ltd. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHYAMA, Masahide 20-13, Misawa 2-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-0032 / JP | 02 /
HARANO, Kenji 585-203, Dairakujimachi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 193-0816 / JP | 03 /
HIJII, Kazuya 30-6, Karakida 1-chome Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0035 / JP | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [2016/40] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/19] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. WUESTHOFF & WUESTHOFF Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02741187.5 | 18.06.2002 | [2005/19] | WO2002JP06039 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03105708 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1529495 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529495 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, // A61B18/00 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
A61B18/149 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00672 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00827 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1472 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/19] | A61B18/14, A61B1/307 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/40] |
Former [2005/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | RESEKTOSKOP | [2005/19] | English: | RESECTOSCOPE | [2005/19] | French: | RESECTOSCOPE | [2005/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2003 | Translation filed | 21.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2003 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 06.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.10.2016 | BE | 05.10.2016 | CY | 05.10.2016 | DK | 05.10.2016 | ES | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | IT | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | NL | 05.10.2016 | SE | 05.10.2016 | TR | 05.10.2016 | GR | 06.01.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | GB | 18.06.2017 | IE | 18.06.2017 | LU | 18.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | FR | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
GB | 18.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.06.2017 | ||
LU | 18.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
GB | 18.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.06.2017 | ||
LU | 18.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
GB | 18.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.06.2017 | ||
LU | 18.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
GB | 18.06.2017 | ||
LU | 18.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/29] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5697909 (EGGERS PHILIP E [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 60 - line 64 * * column 2, line 52 - line 60 * * column 10, line 35 - line 41; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5830212 (CARTMELL ROBERT LOUIS [US], et al) [Y] 3,4* column 2, line 19 - line 31; figure 1 *; | [X]US5843019 (EGGERS PHILIP E [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * * column 15, line 14 - line 30 *; | [X]US6090106 (GOBLE NIGEL MARK [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 24, line 17 - line 50; figures 1,3,17,19 *; | [XY]US2002068930 (TASTO JAMES P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0121]; figure 20 * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0092]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0088] * [Y] 3,4; | [X]US6402742 (BLEWETT JEFFREY J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 30 - line 56; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH0444739 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]WO9700646 (GYRUS MEDICAL LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO9916371 (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]); | [A]JP2000201946 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [XE]JP2002177298 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) | Examination | US6113597 | by applicant | US5697909 | US5830212 | US5843019 | US6090106 | JP2000201946 | US2002068930 | US6402742 |