EP1411490 - IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAKITA, Tomoki 6-1-410, Tsukigaoka, Senriyama Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0847 / JP | 02 /
YAMAKURA, Makoto 3-5-12-102, Takase-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0053 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Mika 14-20-303, Kourien-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0086 / JP | 04 /
KOIZUMI, Takashi 3-3-2, Kasayama Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0072 / JP | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02741229.5 | 21.06.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002JP06206 | Priority number, date | JP20010189234 | 22.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001189234 | [2004/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03001498 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1411490 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/39 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
G09G5/39 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0428 (EP,US);
G09G2360/12 (EP,US);
G09G2360/18 (EP,US);
G09G5/003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/17] | G09G5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2004/17] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2004/17] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES ET APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2004 | Translation filed | 09.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 18.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/16] | 30.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5390293 (NISHIOKA KIYOKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 19, line 8 - column 22, line 7; figures 1,5,15-18,23 * * column 23, line 23 - column 25, line 25; figures 22-27 * [Y] 6-12; | [A]JPH10326084 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005]; figure 4 ** paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011]; figures 1,2 *; | [DY]JPH11184434 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [DY] 6-12 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1A,1B * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1C,1D * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0018]; figure 8 *; | [A]WO0000960 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 7, line 7 - page 9, line 9; figures 3-5 *; | [PA]US2001045946 (HUANG XIAO-YANG [US], et al) [PA] 1-12 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0069]; figures 3,6 *; | [PA]EP1184835 (SHARP KK [JP]) [PA] 1-12 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0042]; figures 9-15 *; | [E]EP1288900 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1,6 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0042]; figures 2-5 * | International search | [X]US5390293 (NISHIOKA KIYOKAZU [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH11184434 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2001005421 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [AP]US2002036610 (ITO AKIHIKO [JP], et al); | [AE]JP2002215115 (NEC CORP) |