EP1402311 - EXTERNAL ELECTRODE FLUORESCENT LAMP, BACK LIGHT UNIT USING THE EXTERNAL ELECTRODE FLUORESCENT LAMP, LCD BACK LIGHT EQUIPMENT USING THE BACK LIGHT UNIT AND DRIVING DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MathBright Technology Co., Ltd. No. 282, Hsin-Yi RD. Tahsi, Taoyuan / TW | For all designated states Lumiette Inc. 1150 Wunderlich Drive San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [2008/28] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states MathBright Technology Co., Ltd. No. 282, Hsin-Yi RD. Tahsi, Taoyuan / TW | ||
For all designated states Mirae Corporation 714 Baeksuk-dong, Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | |||
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Mirae Corporation 714 Baeksuk-dong, Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states GLD Co. Ltd. 400 Frist Science Hall, Dankook University, San 209 Anseo-dong CheonAn-city, Choongnam 330-714 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUR, Jeong-Wook 402-23 HongEun 3-dong, SeoDaeMoon-gu Seoul 120-030 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Jong-Lee 802-1307 Hyundai Rose, Yatab-dong, Bundang-gu SeongNam-city, KyungGi-do 463-070 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Hwan-Woong 1704-1312 JuGong APT. Chang 4-dong, DoBong-gu Seoul 132-044 / KR | 04 /
LIM, Sung-Kyoo 607-201 6 Samsung, JinSan, BoJung-li, GuSeong-eup YongIn-city, KyungGi-do 449-913 / KR | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Zech, Stefan M., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner, Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02741493.7 | 25.06.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002KR01213 | Priority number, date | KR20010036259 | 25.06.2001 Original published format: KR 2001036259 | KR20010065041 | 22.10.2001 Original published format: KR 2001065041 | KR20010068928 | 06.11.2001 Original published format: KR 2001068928 | [2004/14] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03001550 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1402311 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1402311 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357, H01J61/56, // H01J65/04 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
H01J61/307 (EP,US);
H05B41/00 (EP,US);
H05B41/2806 (EP,US);
H05B41/2824 (EP,US);
G02F1/133604 (EP,US);
G02F1/133612 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/10] | G02F1/13357, H01J61/56 | ||
Former IPC [2004/14] | G02F1/13357 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORESZENZLAMPE MIT EXTERNER ELEKTRODE, RÜCKLICHTEINHEIT MIT DER FLUORESZENZLAMPE MIT EXTERNER ELEKTRODE, LCD-RÜCKLICHTEINRICHTUNG MIT DER RÜCKLICHTEINHEIT UND ANSTEUERBAUSTEIN DAFÜR | [2004/14] | English: | EXTERNAL ELECTRODE FLUORESCENT LAMP, BACK LIGHT UNIT USING THE EXTERNAL ELECTRODE FLUORESCENT LAMP, LCD BACK LIGHT EQUIPMENT USING THE BACK LIGHT UNIT AND DRIVING DEVICE THEREOF | [2004/14] | French: | LAMPE FLUORESCENTE A ELECTRODE EXTERNE, UNITE DE RETROECLAIRAGE UTILISANT CETTE LAMPE FLUORESCENTE A ELECTRODE EXTERNE, MATERIEL A CRISTAUX LIQUIDE A RETROECLAIRAGE UTILISANT CETTE UNITE DE RETROECLAIRAGE ET DISPOSITIF D'EXCITATION DE CE DISPOSITIF | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2003 | Translation filed | 29.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 29.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 02.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.2009 | BE | 15.04.2009 | CY | 15.04.2009 | DK | 15.04.2009 | FI | 15.04.2009 | TR | 15.04.2009 | IE | 25.06.2009 | LU | 25.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | GR | 16.07.2009 | PT | 15.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 25.06.2009 | ||
LU | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4945281 (IPSON STANLEY S [GB]) [Y] 11,18-20,22 * column 1, line 45 - line 64 *; column 4, line 9 - line 34; figures 4,9 *; | [A]JPH0950783 (TOKO INC) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0938128 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [Y] 11,18-20,22 * abstract *; paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0008] , [0010]; figures 1,3 *; | [X]JP2000352718 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,7,9 * abstract *; | [L]US6417833 (TAKEMOTO TAKAHIRO [JP]) [L] * abstract *; column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 2; figure -; claim - * | International search | [X]JP2000352718 (NEC CORP); | [X]KR20010004689 (KIM CHUNG SOO [KR], et al); | [Y]KR20010044259 (LS TECH CO LTD [KR]) |