EP1415092 - HIGH PRESSURE FEED PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRT Common Rail Technologies AG Anthoptstrasse 9 Postfach 97 8222 Beringen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states CRT Common Rail Technologies AG Industrieplatz 1 8212 Neuhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPINNLER, Fritz Rentäcker 5 CH-5507 Mellingen / CH | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 02742623.8 | 09.07.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002CH00374 | Priority number, date | CH146001 | 08.08.2001 Original published format: CH 146001 | [2004/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03014569 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1415092 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/04 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
F04B1/0413 (EP,US);
F04B1/04 (KR);
F04B1/0408 (EP,US);
F04B1/0426 (EP,US);
F04B1/0439 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHDRUCKFÖRDERPUMPE | [2004/19] | English: | HIGH PRESSURE FEED PUMP | [2004/19] | French: | POMPE D'ALIMENTATION HAUTE PRESSION | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 01.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3505176 (HAUHINCO MASCHF) [A] 1,3,4,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 42 * * figure - *; | [A]US6077056 (GMELIN KARL [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 42 - column 6, line 48 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19956092 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9950555 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 12 * * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]EP1058001 (SIG SCHWEIZ INDUSTRIEGES [CH]) [DA] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 19 * * figure - * |