EP1389166 - DEVICE FOR INSERTING PACKING ITEMS INTO PACKING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/13] |
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEDUWILT, Ulrich Klarenbergstr. 239/1 73529 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | 02 /
LADE, Guenther Finkenstr. 11 73663 Berglen / DE | 03 /
KRIEGER, Eberhard Lindenstr. 11 71384 Weinstadt / DE | 04 /
GRABOWSKI, Ruediger Brahmstr. 10 71336 Waiblingen / DE | [2004/08] | Application number, filing date | 02742740.0 | 10.05.2002 | [2004/08] | WO2002DE01693 | Priority number, date | DE2001123217 | 12.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10123217 | [2004/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02092432 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1389166 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1389166 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/14] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1389166 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65B5/06, B65B65/02 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
B65B5/06 (EP,US);
B65B35/40 (EP,US);
B65B65/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2005/14] |
Former [2004/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSCHIEBEN VON PACKGUT IN PACKMITTEL | [2004/08] | English: | DEVICE FOR INSERTING PACKING ITEMS INTO PACKING MATERIAL | [2004/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR INSERER UN PRODUIT A EMBALLER DANS UN MATERIAU D'EMBALLAGE | [2004/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/08] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05007363.4 / EP1571084 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.2005
02.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Uhlmann Pac-Systeme GmbH & Co. KG Uhlmannstr. 14-18 D-88471 Laupheim / DE Opponent's representative Wächter, Jochen, et al, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.2005
02.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Uhlmann Pac-Systeme GmbH & Co. KG Uhlmannstr. 14-18 D-88471 Laupheim / DE Opponent's representative Wächter, Jochen (DE), et al, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 D-80336 München / DE | 10.02.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.07.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.09.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 15.02.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 27.12.2007 | Appeal received No. T0085/08 | 05.03.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.09.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 03.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.09.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0465437 (IMA SPA [IT]); | [A]US5787680 (TISMA STEVAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 13, line 9 - column 14, line 65; figure - *; | [A]US5794417 (MOHRMAN JAMES A [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 50 - column 7, line 31; figure - *; | [DA]DE19902453 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 9 - column 5, line 43; figure - * | by applicant | DE4306170 |