EP1392466 - METHOD FOR MONITORING A WELDING PROCESS DURING THE WELDING OF STUDS AND MEASURING AND SORTING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/10] | METHOD FOR MONITORING A WELDING PROCESS DURING THE WELDING OF STUDS AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | ||
[2004/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nelson Bolzenschweiss-Technik GmbH & Co. KG Flurstrasse 7-19 58285 Gevelsberg / DE | [2004/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MADSAK, Jürgen Pastor-Hellweg-Strasse 29a 58339 Breckerfeld / DE | 02 /
CITRICH, Ulrich Balzerholz 14 58285 Gevelsberg / DE | 03 /
KIRCHNER, Eduard St. Dennis Strasse 5 77656 Offenburg / DE | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Eder, Christian Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Eder, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02742746.7 | 15.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002DE01738 | Priority number, date | DE2001124088 | 16.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10124088 | [2004/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02092271 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1392466 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1392466 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/20 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
B23K11/24 (EP,US);
B23K11/0053 (EP,US);
B23K9/095 (EP,US);
B23K9/202 (EP,US);
B23K9/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/11] |
Former [2004/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES SCHWEISSVORGANGS BEIM BOLZENSCHWEISSEN UND MESS- UND AUSWERTEEINRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2005/11] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING A WELDING PROCESS DURING THE WELDING OF STUDS AND MEASURING AND SORTING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [2004/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DU PROCESSUS DE SOUDAGE LORS DU SOUDAGE DE GOUJONS ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE ET DE DEPOUILEMENT DESTINE A LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE | [2004/33] |
Former [2004/10] | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES SCHWEISSEVORGANGS BEIM BOLZENSCHWEISSEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | ||
Former [2004/10] | METHOD FOR MONITORING A WELDING PROCESS DURING THE WELDING OF STUDS AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | ||
Former [2004/10] | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DU PROCESSUS DE SOUDAGE LORS DU SOUDAGE DE GOUJONS ET DISPOSITIF DESTINE A LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 23.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO0176800 (NELSON BOLZENSCHWEISS TECHNIK [DE], et al) [PX] 8 * page 8, line 26 - page 11, line 9; claims 9,10 *; | [XDAY]DE4314528 (TRW NELSON BOLZENSCHWEISSTECHN [DE]) [XD] 8 * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 4 * * column 6, lines 39-49; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,7 [Y] 1,3,5,6; | [XA]DE4437264 (EMHART INC [US]) [X] 8 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 34 * * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 22; figure 1; claims 7-9 * [A] 1,4-6; | [XA]US5977506 (VON DAENIKEN KURT [CH]) [X] 8 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 8 * * column 3, lines 6-51; figures 1,2; claims 1,7 * [A] 1,6; | [Y]DE20006636U (HEINZ SOYER BOLZENSCHWEISTECHN [DE]) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * page 1, lines 8,9 * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0816005 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * page 1, lines 34,35 * * page 4, line 55 - page 5, line 24 * * page 6, lines 40-46; figures 1,3,8 * |