EP1423089 - COSMETIC AND/OR PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATIONS CONTAINING AN EXTRACT FROM PTEROCARPUS MARSUPIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis France, S.A.S. Usine d'Estarac 31360 Boussens / FR | [2005/44] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Cognis France S.A. Boussens 31360 Saint-Martory / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAULY, Gilles 5, rue de Bégonias F-54000 Nancy / FR | 02 /
JEANMAIRE, Christine 34, avenue de la Garenne F-54000 Nancy / FR | 03 /
PAULY-FLORENTINY, Muriel 45, rue du Marechal Oudinot F-54000 Nancy / FR | [2004/47] |
Former [2004/23] | 01 /
PAULY, Gilles 5, rue de Bégonias F-54000 Nancy / FR | ||
02 /
JEANMAIRE, Christine 34, avenue de la Garenne F-54000 Nancy / FR | |||
03 /
PAULY-FLORENTINY, Muriel 23, avenue Anatole France F-54000 Nancy / FR | Representative(s) | Gittinger, Andreas Cognis GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Gittinger, Andreas Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG R - Intellectual Property Postfach 13 01 64 D-40551 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/23] | Fabry, Bernd, Dr. Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co.KG CRT-IP, Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02743083.4 | 23.05.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002EP05659 | Priority number, date | EP20010401427 | 01.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01401427 | [2004/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02098384 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423089 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1423089 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/48, A61K8/362, A61K8/44, A61K8/97, A61K31/19, A61Q19/00 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61K8/362 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/447 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2004/23] | A61K7/48, A61K7/06, A61K35/78, // (A61K35/78, 31:195), A61K31:19 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/16] |
Former [2004/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE UND/ODER PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN ENTHALTEND EINEN EXTRAKT AUS PTEROCARPUS MARSUPIUM | [2004/23] | English: | COSMETIC AND/OR PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATIONS CONTAINING AN EXTRACT FROM PTEROCARPUS MARSUPIUM | [2004/23] | French: | PREPARATIONS COSMETIQUES ET/OU PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT UN EXTRAIT DE PTEROCARPUS MARSUPIUM | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 16.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 31.03.2004 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 21.04.2004 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 14.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0956867 (LIEBEL FRANZ PETER DR [DE]) [A] 1* claim 1 * |