EP1392807 - CLEANING METHOD FOR REMOVING STARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul, MN 55102-2233 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul MN 55102-2233 / US | ||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Ecolab Inc. 370 Wabasha Street N St. Paul, MN 55102-1390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STROTHOFF, Werner Glandorfer Strasse 9 48336 Sassenberg Füchtorf / DE | 02 /
MAIER, Helmut Cimbernstrasse 5 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | polypatent Patentanwälte An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | Application number, filing date | 02743135.2 | 31.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002EP05964 | Priority number, date | DE2001127919 | 08.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10127919 | [2004/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02100993 | Date: | 19.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1392807 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1392807 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/02, C11D3/20, C11D7/06, C11D7/08, C11D7/26 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
C11D7/08 (EP,US);
C11D7/06 (EP,US);
C11D7/265 (EP,US);
C11D7/34 (EP,US);
C11D7/36 (EP,US);
C11D2111/14 (EP,US);
C11D2111/44 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR STÄRKEENTFERNUNG | [2004/10] | English: | CLEANING METHOD FOR REMOVING STARCH | [2004/10] | French: | PROCEDE D'EPURATION DESTINE A L'ELIMINATION D'AMIDON | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 18.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 22.09.2004 | IE | 22.09.2004 | TR | 22.09.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | SE | 22.12.2004 | PT | 22.02.2005 | CY | 31.05.2005 | LU | 31.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/27] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
IE | 22.09.2004 | ||
TR | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
IE | 22.09.2004 | ||
TR | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
IE | 22.09.2004 | ||
TR | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
IE | 22.09.2004 | ||
TR | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
IE | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
IE | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 22.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2343145 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) [X] 1-14 * page 2, paragraph 2 ** page 6, paragraph 1; example - *; | [X]WO9524148 (DEEAY TECH LTD [IL], et al) [X] 13,14 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE19503060 (HENKEL ECOLAB GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1-14 * column 4, lines 31-57 *; | [X]EP0806472 (WEIGERT CHEM FAB [DE]) [X] 13,14 * example 1 *; | [X]EP0808894 (WEIGERT CHEM FAB [DE]) [X] 1-14 * column 5, lines 30-45; claims 1-10 *; | [XD]WO9830673 (DEEAY TECH LTD [IL], et al) [XD] 13,14 * page 5, lines 3,4; claims 1-8 *; | [X]WO9900474 (ERIKSSON TORD GEORG [SE]) [X] 1-14 * example 3; claim 4 *; | [X]US6098639 (ROBINSON KARL M [US]) [X] 1-14 * figure 1; claims 11-43 *; | [X]EP1026230 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-14 * example 1; claim - * |