EP1412864 - NON-VOLATILE MEMORY ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD IN A MULTIPROCESSOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAPPISCH, Steffen Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GELKE, Hans-Joachim Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02743575.9 | 08.07.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002IB02896 | Priority number, date | EP20010117358 | 18.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01117358 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03009151 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1412864 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/16 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
G06F13/1689 (EP,US);
G06F9/38 (KR);
G06F13/1663 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/18] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINEN NICHTFLÜCHTIGEN SPEICHER IN EINEM MULTIPROZESSORGERÄT | [2004/18] | English: | NON-VOLATILE MEMORY ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD IN A MULTIPROCESSOR DEVICE | [2004/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE MEMOIRE NON-VOLATILE DANS UN DISPOSITIF MULTIPROCESSEUR | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 02.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5930502 (PICCO ANDRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 30 - column 3, line 4 * * claims 1-8 *; | [A]US5787488 (GARDE DOUGLAS [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 58 - column 4, line 15 * * figures 1-3D * |