EP1538980 - DEVICE FOR BODY AESTHETICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/24] | DEVICES AND METHODOLOGIES USEFUL IN BODY AESTHETICS | ||
[2016/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ultrashape Ltd. P.O. Box 80 20692 Yokneam / IL | [2017/03] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Ultrashape Ltd. P.O. Box 80 20692 Yokneam / IL | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Ultrashape Inc. 31 Habarzel Street 69710 Tel Aviv / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESHEL, Yoram 38 Kisufim Street 69355 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
KUSHCULEY, Leonid 10 Ezra Street 76201 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
SVERDLIK, Ariel 39 Shimon Hatarsi Street 62492 Tel Aviv / IL | 04 /
VITSNUDEL, Ilia 79 Haatzmaut Street 40500 Even Yehuda / IL | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2014/04] |
Former [2011/35] | Jennings, Michael John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2005/24] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02743588.2 | 25.06.2002 | [2005/24] | WO2002IL00510 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004000116 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1538980 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1538980 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/00 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
A61Q19/06 (EP,US);
A61B8/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (KR);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/375 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61N7/00 (EP,US);
A61N7/02 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61Q17/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2065 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2072 (EP,US);
A61B2090/065 (EP,US);
A61B2090/378 (EP,US);
A61B34/25 (EP,US);
A61B90/361 (EP,US);
A61M2202/08 (EP,US);
A61N2007/0008 (EP,US);
A61N2007/0078 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/24] | A61B5/055 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE KÖRPERÄSTHETIK | [2016/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR BODY AESTHETICS | [2016/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'ESTHETIQUE CORPORELLE | [2016/13] |
Former [2005/24] | NÜTZLICHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND METHODEN FÜR DIE KÖRPERÄSTHETIK | ||
Former [2005/24] | DEVICES AND METHODOLOGIES USEFUL IN BODY AESTHETICS | ||
Former [2005/24] | DISPOSITIFS ET METHODES UTILES EN ESTHETIQUE CORPORELLE | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.02.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 05.02.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2009 | 30.06.2016 | 15   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2017 | CY | 18.01.2017 | DK | 18.01.2017 | ES | 18.01.2017 | FI | 18.01.2017 | IT | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | NL | 18.01.2017 | SE | 18.01.2017 | TR | 18.01.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | IE | 25.06.2017 | LU | 25.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 25.06.2017 | ||
LU | 25.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 25.06.2017 | ||
LU | 25.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 25.06.2017 | ||
LU | 25.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
LU | 25.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5209221 (RIEDLINGER RAINER [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figures 2,3 ** column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 32 * | International search | [A]US4986275 (ISHIDA AKINORI [JP], et al); | [A]US5143073 (DORY JACQUES [FR]); | [X]US5143063 (FELLNER DONALD G [US]); | [X]US5507790 (WEISS WILLIAM V [CA]); | [A]US6071239 (CRIBBS ROBERT W [US], et al) | Examination | EP1362223 | by applicant | JPS58181399 | US4986275 | US5143063 | US5143073 | US5209221 | US5301660 | US5431621 | JPH0889893 | US5507790 | US5526815 | GB2303552 | JPH10277483 | US5884631 | JPH11187493 | US6039048 | US6071239 | US6113558 | US6206873 | WO0224076 |