EP1392171 - SEED LOCALIZATION SYSTEM AND METHOD IN ULTRASOUND BY FLUOROSCOPY AND ULTRASOUND FUSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Varian Medical Systems, Inc. 3100 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2009/03] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Varian Medical Systems Technologies, Inc. 3100 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94304-1038 / US | ||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Varian Medical Systems, Inc. 3100 Hansen Way, M/S E-339 Palo Alto, CA 94304-1038 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THORNTON, Kenneth, B. 47641 Corner Square Sterling, Virginia 20165 / US | [2004/24] |
Former [2004/10] | 01 /
THORNTON, Kenneth, B. 2820 Hydraulic Road, Apt. 203 Charlottesville, VA 22901 / US | Representative(s) | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen, Macara & Co., 6-8 Swakeleys Road, Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02744257.3 | 06.06.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002US18227 | Priority number, date | US20010875031 | 07.06.2001 Original published format: US 875031 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02098285 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1392171 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, A61B6/12 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
A61N5/1048 (EP,US);
A61B6/12 (EP,US);
A61B6/5247 (EP,US);
A61B8/0833 (EP,US);
A61B8/0841 (EP,US);
A61B8/4416 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/21] | A61B6/12 | ||
Former IPC [2004/10] | A61B8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEED-LOKALISATIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ULTRASCHALL MIT FLUOROSKOPIE- UND ULTRASCHALLFUSION | [2004/10] | English: | SEED LOCALIZATION SYSTEM AND METHOD IN ULTRASOUND BY FLUOROSCOPY AND ULTRASOUND FUSION | [2004/10] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE REPERAGE DE GRAINS PAR ULTRASONS PAR FLUOROSCOPIE ET FUSION PAR ULTRASONS | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 17.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9960921 (BURDETTE MEDICAL SYSTEMS [US]) [X] 1-10,19-30* page 14 *; | [X]WO0025865 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US]) [X] 1-10,19-30 * page 17 *; | [X]EP1070519 (NUCLETRON BV [NL]) [X] 1-10,19-30 * paragraphs [0003] , [0018] *; | [X]EP1088524 (LIFE IMAGING SYSTEMS INC [CA]) [X] 1-10,19-30 * paragraph [0022] *; | [PX]WO0182995 (ALPHA INTERVENTION TECHNOLOGY [US]) [PX] 1-10,19-30 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5531227 (SCHNEIDER M BRET [US]); | [Y]US6006126 (COSMAN ERIC R [US]); | [YP]US6256529 (HOLUPKA EDWARD J [US], et al); | [Y]US6206832 (DOWNEY DONAL [CA], et al); | [YP]US6327490 (SPETZ KEVIN STEWART [US]) |