EP1407005 - INTEGRATIVE ASSAYS FOR MONITORING MOLECULAR ASSEMBLY EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interleukin Genetics, Inc. 135 Beaver Street Waltham, MA 02452 / US | [2004/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOWER, Steven Hopwood House, High Moscar Sheffiel d S6 6GR / GB | 02 /
DUFF, Gordon, W. 18 Ashgate Road Yorkshire, Sheffield S10 3B2 / GB | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2004/52] | Crump, Julian Richard John Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2004/16] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02744266.4 | 11.06.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002US18346 | Priority number, date | US20010297305P | 11.06.2001 Original published format: US 297305 P | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02101015 | Date: | 19.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1407005 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/10, C12N15/12, C12N15/62, G01N33/53, G01N33/567, C07K14/705, C07K14/715, G01N33/542, G01N33/68 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
G01N33/6869 (EP,US);
G01N33/542 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/16] | C12N5/10, C12N15/12, C12N15/62, G01N33/53, G01N33/567, C07K14/705, C07K14/715 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/16] | Title | German: | INTEGRATIVE ASSAYS ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG MOLEKULARER ZUSAMMENBAUEREIGNISSE | [2004/16] | English: | INTEGRATIVE ASSAYS FOR MONITORING MOLECULAR ASSEMBLY EVENTS | [2004/16] | French: | TECHNIQUES D'ESSAIS INTEGRATIFS POUR LE CONTROLE D'EVENEMENTS D'ASSEMBLAGE MOLECULAIRE | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/41] | 25.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0105974 (INTERLEUKIN GENETICS INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * * page 53, paragraph 3 * * page 81, line 2 - line 5 *; | [X] - GUO C ET AL, "FLUORESCENCE RESONANCE ENERGY TRANSFER REVEALS INTERLEUKIN (IL)-1-DEPENDENT AGGREGATION OF IL-1 TYPE I RECEPTORS THAT CORRELATES WITH RECEPTOR ACTIVATION", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19951117), vol. 270, no. 46, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 27562 - 27568, XP000882822 [X] 1-10,13-19 * the whole document * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.46.27562 | [X] - CHAN FRANCIS KA-MING ET AL, "A domain in TNF receptors that mediates ligand-independent receptor assembly and signaling", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (2000), vol. 288, no. 5475, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 2351 - 2354, XP002174460 [X] 1-10,13-19 * figure 2B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.288.5475.2351 | [X] - SIEGEL RICHARD M ET AL, "Fas preassociation required for apoptosis signaling and dominant inhibition by pathogenic mutations", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (20000630), vol. 288, no. 5475, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 2354 - 2357, XP002174461 [X] 1-10,13-19 * figures 2A,B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.288.5475.2354 | [X] - JAHN THOMAS ET AL, "The use of EGFP fusion constructs to analyze cytokine factor receptor activation in vivo by fluorescence microscopy and FRET (fluorescence energy transfer) based applications", BLOOD, & FORTY-FIRST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY; NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, USA; DECEMBER 3-7, 1999, (19991115), vol. 94, no. 10 SUPPL. 1 PART 1, ISSN 0006-4971, page 46a, XP008052764 [X] 1-10,13-19 * the whole document * | [X] - SORKIN A ET AL, "Interaction of EGF receptor and Grb2 in living cells visualized by fluorescence resonance energy transfer (FRET) microscopy", CURRENT BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE,, GB, (2000), vol. 10, no. 21, ISSN 0960-9822, pages 1395 - 1398, XP002216958 [X] 1-10,13-19 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(00)00785-5 | [X] - MCVEY MARY ET AL, "Monitoring receptor oligomerization using time-resolved fluorescence resonance energy transfer and bioluminescence resonance energy transfer: The human delta-opioid receptor displays constitutive oligomerization at the cell surface, which is not regulated by receptor occupancy", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20010427), vol. 276, no. 17, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 14092 - 14099, XP002345708 [X] 1-10,13-19 * page 14098, column 1, line 11 - line 20 * | [X] - JANETOPOULOS CHRIS ET AL, "Receptor-mediated activation of heterotrimeric G-proteins in living cells", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (20010323), vol. 291, no. 5512, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 2408 - 2411, XP002187587 [X] 1-10,13-19 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1055835 | [X] - SIEGEL R ET AL, "Measurement of molecular interactions in living cells by fluorescence resonance energy transfer betwen variants of green fluorescent protein", STKE SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION KNOWLEDGE ENVIRONMENT, (20000627), ISSN 1525-8882, pages 1 - 6, XP002311011 [X] 1-10,13-19 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6066476 ; | [A]US5981200 |