EP1387612 - PYRIDINYL FUSED BICYCLIC AMIDE AS FUNGICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Ying 161 Thompson Drive Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02744275.5 | 14.05.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002US18394 | Priority number, date | US20010290884P | 15.05.2001 Original published format: US 290884 P | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02091830 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1387612 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/42, A01N43/90, C07D215/40, C07D401/12, C07D221/04, C07D471/04, C07D491/04 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
C07D221/04 (EP);
A01N43/42 (EP);
C07D215/40 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP);
C07D491/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/42, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/42, A01N61/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/09] |
Former [2004/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONDENSIERTE PYRIDIN BICYCLISCHE AMIDE ALS FUNGIZIDE | [2004/07] | English: | PYRIDINYL FUSED BICYCLIC AMIDE AS FUNGICIDES | [2004/07] | French: | AMIDES BICYCLIQUES A FUSION PYRIDINYLE UTILISES COMME FONGICIDES | [2004/07] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/24] | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0378308 (SCHERING AGROCHEMICALS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,9 * page 8 - page 13 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9637473 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,9 * claim 1 *; | [AD]WO9942447 (AGREVO UK LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1 * page 15 - page 25; table 1 ** claim 1 * |