EP1448769 - SOFT IONIZATION DEVICE AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ionfinity LLC 2400 Lincoln Avenue Altadena, CA 91001 / US | [2004/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTLEY, Frank, T. 529 E. Las Flores Arcadia, CA 91006 / US | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/35] | 01 /
HARTLEY, Frank, T. 4800 Oak Grove Drive Pasadena, CA 91109 / US | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02744678.0 | 25.06.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002US20353 | Priority number, date | US20010336841P | 31.10.2001 Original published format: US 336841 P | US20020347685P | 08.01.2002 Original published format: US 347685 P | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03038086 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1448769 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N13/00, G01N24/00, H01J7/24, H01J49/16 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
H01J49/168 (EP,US);
H01J27/02 (EP,US);
H01J27/26 (EP,US);
H01J3/027 (EP,US);
H01J3/04 (EP,US);
H01J37/08 (EP,US);
H01J49/0018 (EP,US);
H01J49/0427 (EP,US);
G01N2223/612 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/35] | C12N13/00, G01N24/00, H01J7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR WEICHEN IONISIERUNG UND ANWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | [2004/35] | English: | SOFT IONIZATION DEVICE AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF | [2004/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE IONISATION DOUCE ET APPLICATIONS DE CE DERNIER | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 03.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0346271 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]) [X] 1,7 * column 4, line 44 - column 6, line 55; figure 4h *; | [A]US5245192 (HOUSEMAN BARTON L [US]) [A] 1,7* column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 17 *; | [X]DE19755990 (INST MIKROTECHNIK MAINZ GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 38; figure 3j * | International search | [Y]US6060327 (KEEN RANDY E [US]); | [X]US4311669 (SPANGLER GLENN E); | [Y]US5726076 (TASKER WILLIAM G [US], et al); | [Y]US5053343 (VORA KISHORE N [US], et al); | [Y]US6159686 (KARDOS KEITH W [US], et al); | [X]US5879949 (COLE RICHARD B [US], et al); | [X]US5962288 (AKSENOV YURI VASILYEVICH [RU], et al); | [Y]US5192865 (ZHU JIANZHONG [US]); | [X]US4027165 (JACOBS MARTIN E); | [X]US5909086 (KIM SOO-IN [KR], et al) |