EP1416983 - Connection of housing sections of an administration device for dosed administration of a distributable product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/20] | CONNECTION OF HOUSING SECTIONS OF AN ADMINISTRATION DEVICE FOR DOSED ADMINISTRATION OF A DISTRIBUTABLE PRODUCT | ||
[2007/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TecPharma Licensing AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | [2007/31] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Tecpharma Licensing AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRCHHOFER, Fritz Wassermatt CH-3454 Sumiswald / CH | 02 /
GRAF, Roney Brugergasse 23 CH-3400 Burgdorf / CH | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte P.O. Box 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/49] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02745038.6 | 22.07.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002CH00412 | Priority number, date | DE20012012501U | 30.07.2001 Original published format: DE 20112501 U | DE20011063329 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10163329 | [2004/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03011373 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1416983 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1416983 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, A61M5/315 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
A61M5/315 (EP,US);
A61M5/31553 (EP,US);
A61M2205/582 (EP,US);
A61M5/14566 (EP,US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/31501 (EP,US);
A61M5/31535 (EP,US);
A61M5/3156 (EP,US);
A61M5/31563 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbindung von Gehäuseabschnitten eines Verabreichungsgeräts für eine dosierte Verabreichung eines ausschüttbaren Produkts | [2007/11] | English: | Connection of housing sections of an administration device for dosed administration of a distributable product | [2007/11] | French: | Assemblage de sections de boîtier d'un appareil d'administration de produit pour administrer de manière dosée un produit déversable | [2007/11] |
Former [2004/20] | VERBINDUNG VON GEHÄUSEABSCHNITTEN EINES VERABREICHUNGSGERÄTS FÜR EINE DOSIERTE VERABREICHUNG EINES AUSSCHÜTTBAREN PRODUKTS | ||
Former [2004/20] | CONNECTION OF HOUSING SECTIONS OF AN ADMINISTRATION DEVICE FOR DOSED ADMINISTRATION OF A DISTRIBUTABLE PRODUCT | ||
Former [2004/20] | ASSEMBLAGE DE SECTIONS DE BOITIER D'UN APPAREIL D'ADMINISTRATION DE PRODUIT POUR ADMINISTRER DE MANIERE DOSEE UN PRODUIT DEVERSABLE | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.08.2007 | CZ | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | EE | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | IE | 01.08.2007 | NL | 01.08.2007 | SK | 01.08.2007 | TR | 01.08.2007 | BG | 01.11.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | ES | 12.11.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 01.08.2007 | |
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 01.08.2007 | |
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 01.08.2007 | |
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 12.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4973318 (HOLM NIELS E [DK], et al) [A] 1,19,26,27 * column A ** column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 42; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0498737 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,19,26,27 * abstract *; | [XA]DE4425763 (BRAUN MEDICAL AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,7-12,14-16 * the whole document * [A] 19-21,26,27; | [A]US5611783 (MIKKELSEN S REN [DK]) [A] 1-27 * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 15; figures 1-5 *; | [DA]WO9717095 (DISETRONIC MEDICAL SYSTEMS AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1-27 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9532749 |