EP1372544 - DEVICE FOR PIVOTABLY CONNECTING PARTS OF AN ORTHOPAEDIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto Bock Healthcare Products GmbH Kaiserstrasse 39 1070 Wien / AT | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Otto Bock Austria GES.M.B.H. Kaiserstrasse 39 A 1070 Wein / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DE VEEN, Paul, Gerard Oldenzaalsestraat 207 NL-7523 AC Enschede / NL | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | Rehmann, Thorsten, Dipl.-Ing., et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 02745199.6 | 30.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002EP03588 | Priority number, date | NL20011017771 | 04.04.2001 Original published format: NL 1017771 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02080825 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1372544 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1372544 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/64 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
A61F2/644 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5003 (EP,US);
A61F2002/6614 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM DREHBAREN VERBINDEN VON TEILEN EINER ORTHOPÄDISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2004/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR PIVOTABLY CONNECTING PARTS OF AN ORTHOPAEDIC DEVICE | [2004/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT PAR PIVOTEMENT DE PARTIES D'UN DISPOSITIF ORTHOPEDIQUE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 06.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.05.2007 | CH | 30.05.2007 | CY | 30.05.2007 | DK | 30.05.2007 | FI | 30.05.2007 | IT | 30.05.2007 | LI | 30.05.2007 | NL | 30.05.2007 | TR | 30.05.2007 | SE | 30.08.2007 | GR | 31.08.2007 | ES | 10.09.2007 | PT | 30.10.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | BE | 30.05.2007 | |
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | BE | 30.05.2007 | |
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | BE | 30.05.2007 | |
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BE | 30.05.2007 | |
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | BE | 30.05.2007 | |
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | BE | 30.05.2007 | |
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 10.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2134392 (HANGER & CO LTD J E) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO9607378 (UNIV TOLEDO [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5545232 (VEEN PAUL GERARD VAN DE [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5888236 (VAN DE VEEN PAUL GERAD [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract * |