EP1412270 - DEVICE FOR STACKING SHEETS, ESPECIALLY SHEETS OF PAPER OR CARDBOARD TRANSPORTED BY A STREAM FEEDER, ONTO PALLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bielomatik Jagenberg GmbH + Co. KG Jagenbergstrasse 1 41468 Neuss / DE | [2009/31] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Bielomatik Jagenberg GmbH + Co. KG Jagenbergstrasse 1 41468 Neuss / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STITZ, Albert Eichen 3 51515 Kürten / DE | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Thul, Hermann, et al Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Thul, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys., et al Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/18] | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Jostarndt - Thul, Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02745394.3 | 19.06.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002EP06762 | Priority number, date | DE2001134425 | 19.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10134425 | [2004/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03008313 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1412270 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1412270 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65H31/38 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
B65H31/38 (EP,US);
B65H2301/42172 (EP,US);
B65H2701/176 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM STAPELN VON BÖGEN, INSBESONDERE VON GESCHUPPT ZUGEFÖRDERTEN PAPIER- ODER KARTONBÖGEN AUF PALETTEN | [2004/18] | English: | DEVICE FOR STACKING SHEETS, ESPECIALLY SHEETS OF PAPER OR CARDBOARD TRANSPORTED BY A STREAM FEEDER, ONTO PALLETS | [2004/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EMPILAGE DE FEUILLES, EN PARTICULIER DE FEUILLES DE PAPIER OU DE CARTON, TRANSPORTEES PAR MARGEUR A NAPPE, SUR DES PALETTES | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.07.2009 | DK | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | IE | 29.07.2009 | NL | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | TR | 29.07.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/37] | CY | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | SE | 29.07.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3713651 (ABLER N); | [YD]DE2942855 (GRAFISCHE TECH AUTOMATION [DE]) [YD] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2186553 (WARTSILA STRECKER G M B H) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, column R, line 107 - page 2, column L, line 7 * * page 2, column L, line 65 - column R, line 100; figure -; claims 1,4-6 *; | [DA]WO0020315 (JAGENBERG PAPIERTECH GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * page 1 *; | [A]DE19914068 (WILL E C H GMBH & CO [DE]) |