EP1412590 - BUILDING BAR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ekobalk Oy Lehvänkatu 10 33820 Tampere / FI | [2004/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAINIONPÄÄ, Pentti Härkälahdentie 521 FIN-40957 Muurame / FI | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Helke, Kimmo Kalervo Kespat Oy P.O. Box 601 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Helke, Kimmo Kalervo Kespat Oy, P.O. Box 601 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | Application number, filing date | 02745449.5 | 02.07.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002FI00596 | Priority number, date | FI20010001440 | 02.07.2001 Original published format: FI 20011440 | [2004/18] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004791 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1412590 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04B5/29, E04C3/293 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
E04C3/293 (EP,US);
E04B5/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUSTABSYSTEM | [2004/18] | English: | BUILDING BAR SYSTEM | [2004/18] | French: | SYSTEME DE BARRES DE BATIMENT | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2002 | Translation filed | 26.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 26.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/31] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2510958 (LEO COFF); | [A]US4394807 (CARROLL FRANK E [US]); | [A]WO9001596 (LIITTOPALKKI OY [FI]); | [A]WO9012173 (PEIKKORAKENNE OY [FI]) |