EP1407340 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR VERIFYING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES AND ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORVINEN, Vesa, Matti Liisankatu 5 B 53 FIN-00170 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
BOGESTAM, Kent Hägerstensvägen 175 S-126 53 Hägersten / SE | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Barrett, Peter Andrew John, et al Ericsson Limited Patent Unit Optical Networks Unit 4 Midleton Gate Guildford Business Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 8SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Barrett, Peter Andrew John, et al Ericsson Limited Patent Unit Optical Networks Unit 4 Midleton Gate Guildford Business Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 8SG / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | Lind, Robert, et al Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2004/16] | Kärkkäinen, Veli-Matti, et al Borenius & Co Oy Ab Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 02745460.2 | 08.07.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002FI00618 | Priority number, date | FI20010001498 | 09.07.2001 Original published format: FI 20011498 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03007133 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1407340 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, H04L9/32 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM VERIFIZIEREN ELEKTRONISCHER UNTERSCHRIFTEN UND EINRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE UNTERSCHRIFTEN | [2004/16] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR VERIFYING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES AND ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE DEVICE | [2004/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE VERIFICATION DE SIGNATURES ELECTRONIQUES ET DISPOSITIF DE SIGNATURE ELECTRONIQUE | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 30.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/38] | 27.02.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.05.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/38] | Appeal following examination | 25.04.2008 | Appeal received No. T1366/08 | 23.06.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.05.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 30.05.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2004 | Request for further processing for: | 17.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0859500 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-87; | [XA]WO9949404 (TELCORDIA TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-12,19-29,32-46,49-53,60-87 [A] 13-18,30,31,47,48,54-59; | [A]WO0050984 (PIPEBEACH AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-87; | [PA]FR2817108 (MERCURY TECHNOLOGIES SARL [FR])[PA] 1-87 |