EP1408893 - AN INFLATABLE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY PLC 310-312 Dallow Road Luton Bedfordshire LU1 1TD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states HUNTLEIGH TECHNOLOGY PLC 310-312 Dallow Road Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 1TD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMPSON, David, Mark 34 Highfields, Llandaff Cardiff CF5 2QB / GB | 02 /
SCHILD, Rolf 5 Byron Drive London N2 0BD / GB | 03 /
WEBSTER, Nathan 3 Brecon Court, Canton Cardiff CF5 1RH / GB | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Thaker, Shalini Group IP Department Huntleigh Technology PLC 310-312 Dallow Road Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 1TD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Thaker, Shalini Group IP Department, Huntleigh Technology PLC 310-312 Dallow Road Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 1TD / GB | ||
Former [2004/17] | Thaker, Shalini Huntleigh Technology plc 310-312 Dallow Road Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 1TD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02745622.7 | 15.07.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002GB03219 | Priority number, date | GB20010017707 | 20.07.2001 Original published format: GB 0117707 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03007855 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1408893 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1408893 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01, A61F13/08 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
A61H9/0092 (EP,US);
A61F13/085 (EP,US);
A61F5/012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/47] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBLASBARE VORRICHTUNG | [2004/17] | English: | AN INFLATABLE APPARATUS | [2004/17] | French: | APPAREIL GONFLABLE | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 27.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2005 | BG | 12.01.2005 | CH | 12.01.2005 | CZ | 12.01.2005 | EE | 12.01.2005 | FI | 12.01.2005 | GR | 12.01.2005 | LI | 12.01.2005 | SK | 12.01.2005 | TR | 12.01.2005 | PT | 12.06.2005 | CY | 15.07.2005 | IE | 15.07.2005 | LU | 15.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/04] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
CY | 15.07.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
LU | 15.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
CY | 15.07.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
LU | 15.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
CY | 15.07.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/01] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 12.01.2005 | |
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 12.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2724129 (PUGH JOHN G) [Y] 3,4 * column 2, line 29 - line 41 *; | [XY]US3826249 (LEE A, et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - line 57 * [Y] 3,4; | [A]US4300759 (CAPLAN DAVID M) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4841956 (GARDNER ARTHUR M N [GB], et al); | [A]EP0388200 (KENDALL & CO [US]); | [X]WO9856331 (ACI MEDICAL [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 7, line 6 - line 22; figures 3,4 * |