EP1461870 - HIGH PERFORMANCE AUDIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR MOTORCYCLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BHM S.r.l. Via Federico Borromeo 4 20017 Rho MI / IT | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Sitec Italia S.r.l. Via Venini, 37 20127 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIGALA, Valentina Via F. Filzi, 23 I-20124 Milan / IT | 02 /
GARAVAGLIA, Roberto Via Bernardino Luini, 7 I-20014 Nerviano-Milan / IT | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02745705.0 | 11.07.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002IB02716 | Priority number, date | IT2001MI01480 | 11.07.2001 Original published format: IT MI20011480 | [2007/52] |
Former [2004/40] | IT2001MI00148 | 11.07.2001 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03013014 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1461870 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1461870 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
H04B1/3822 (EP,US);
H04B2001/3866 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHLEISTUNGS-AUDIOKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM FÜR MOTORRÄDER | [2004/40] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE AUDIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR MOTORCYCLES | [2004/40] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION AUDIO HAUTEMENT PERFORMANT POUR MOTOCYCLES | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2003 | Translation filed | 31.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 21.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.08.2007 | BE | 29.08.2007 | CH | 29.08.2007 | CY | 29.08.2007 | CZ | 29.08.2007 | DK | 29.08.2007 | EE | 29.08.2007 | FI | 29.08.2007 | LI | 29.08.2007 | NL | 29.08.2007 | SK | 29.08.2007 | TR | 29.08.2007 | BG | 29.11.2007 | SE | 29.11.2007 | DE | 30.11.2007 | GR | 30.11.2007 | ES | 10.12.2007 | PT | 29.01.2008 | FR | 25.04.2008 | [2013/51] |
Former [2012/40] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CY | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
TR | 29.08.2007 | ||
BG | 29.11.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
DE | 30.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
FR | 25.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CY | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
TR | 29.08.2007 | ||
BG | 29.11.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
DE | 30.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CY | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
BG | 29.11.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
DE | 30.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CY | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
DE | 30.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
DE | 30.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
DE | 30.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 29.08.2007 | |
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 29.08.2007 | |
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 10.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4109105 (VON STATTEN JR RICHARD J) [A] 1-19 * abstract ** figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1081872 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * column 3, line 51 - column 16, line 23 * * figures 1-23 * |