EP1417769 - SIGNAL CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINI, Maria, G. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CHIANI, Marco Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02745723.3 | 02.07.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002IB02800 | Priority number, date | EP20010202877 | 27.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01202877 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03013004 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1417769 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/35, H04L1/00 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H04L1/0061 (EP,US);
H04N19/89 (KR);
H03M13/09 (EP,KR,US);
H03M13/35 (EP,US);
H04L1/00 (EP,US);
H04L1/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/20] | Title | German: | SIGNALKODIERUNG | [2004/20] | English: | SIGNAL CODING | [2004/20] | French: | CODAGE DE SIGNAUX | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/01] | 16.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5878041 (YAMANAKA MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]EP0942569 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [DX]US5991912 (MAO WEIDONG [US]); | [A]EP0966107 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); |