EP1408269 - PIPE THREAD JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | For all designated states VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE 54 rue Anatole France 59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
For all designated states VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE 54 rue Anatole France 59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR | |||
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
For all designated states VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE 54 rue Anatole France 59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR | |||
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Jun c/o Sumitomo Met.Ind.,Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02745965.0 | 11.07.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002JP07053 | Priority number, date | JP20010213469 | 13.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001213469 | [2004/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03006867 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1408269 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1408269 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16L15/00 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
F16L15/004 (EP,US);
Y10S285/917 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHRGEWINDEVERBINDUNG | [2004/16] | English: | PIPE THREAD JOINT | [2004/16] | French: | JOINT POUR FILETAGE | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2004 | Translation filed | 15.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 03.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.12.2006 | CH | 27.12.2006 | CY | 27.12.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | EE | 27.12.2006 | FI | 27.12.2006 | LI | 27.12.2006 | NL | 27.12.2006 | SK | 27.12.2006 | TR | 27.12.2006 | BG | 27.03.2007 | SE | 27.03.2007 | GR | 28.03.2007 | PT | 28.05.2007 | IE | 11.07.2007 | LU | 11.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | BE | 27.12.2006 | |
CH | 27.12.2006 | ||
CY | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
EE | 27.12.2006 | ||
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
LI | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
SK | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
LU | 11.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | BE | 27.12.2006 | |
CH | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
EE | 27.12.2006 | ||
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
LI | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
SK | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | BE | 27.12.2006 | |
CH | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
LI | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
SK | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | BE | 27.12.2006 | |
CH | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
LI | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
SK | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | BE | 27.12.2006 | |
CH | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
LI | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
SK | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | BE | 27.12.2006 | |
CH | 27.12.2006 | ||
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
LI | 27.12.2006 | ||
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | BE | 27.12.2006 | |
CH | 27.12.2006 | ||
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
LI | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | BE | 27.12.2006 | |
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 27.12.2006 | |
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0364413 (DALMINE SPA [IT]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0786616 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]EP0916883 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0062]; figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]JPS61124792 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]US4623173 (HANDA MASAO [JP], et al); | [A]US4692988 (SHULVER RODERICK L [GB], et al); | [A]JPS639794 (NIPPON KOKAN KK, et al); | [A]JPH0610154 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [A]JPH0972467 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JP2001065752 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]WO0148411 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS61124792 | US4623173 | US4732416 | US5137310 | JPH0610154 | US5423579 | JPH07217777 | JPH08145248 |