EP1418429 - METHOD OF QUANTIFYING DENATURED LIPOPROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/20] | METHOD OF QUANTIFYING DENATURED LIPOPROTEIN, REAGENTS FOR QUANTIFYING DENATURED LIPOPROTEIN, METHOD OF DETECTING CIRCULATORY DISEASE AND REAGENTS FOR DETECTING CIRCULATORY DISEASE | ||
[2010/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA MEDEX CO., LTD. 1-1 Irifune 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0042 / JP | [2010/34] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states KYOWA MEDEX CO., LTD. 1-1 Irifune 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0042 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOHNO, Hiroaki, Head Office, Kyowa Medex Co., Ltd. 1-1, Irifune 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0042 / JP | 02 /
YANAGISAWA, T., T. R. L., Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd 6-6, Asahi-machi, 3-chome Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | 03 /
MASUNARI, T., Head Office, Kyowa Medex Co., Ltd 1-1, Irifune, 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-0042 / JP | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02746016.1 | 12.07.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002JP07116 | Priority number, date | JP20010212522 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001212522 | [2004/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03006989 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1418429 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1418429 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/92 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/92 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (KR);
G01N2405/04 (EP,US);
G01N2800/32 (EP,US);
G01N2800/323 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/20] | G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON DENATURIERTEM LIPOPROTEIN | [2010/12] | English: | METHOD OF QUANTIFYING DENATURED LIPOPROTEIN | [2010/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE QUANTIFICATION DE LIPOPROTEINES DENATUREES | [2010/12] |
Former [2004/20] | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON DENATURIERTEM LIPOPROTEIN, REAGENZIEN ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON DENATURIERTEM LIPOPROTEIN, VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS EINER KREISLAUFERKRANKUNG UND REAGENZIEN ZUM NACHWEIS EINER KREISLAUFERKRANKUNG | ||
Former [2004/20] | METHOD OF QUANTIFYING DENATURED LIPOPROTEIN, REAGENTS FOR QUANTIFYING DENATURED LIPOPROTEIN, METHOD OF DETECTING CIRCULATORY DISEASE AND REAGENTS FOR DETECTING CIRCULATORY DISEASE | ||
Former [2004/20] | PROCEDE DE QUANTIFICATION DE LIPOPROTEINES DENATUREES, REACTIFS POUR LA QUANTIFICATION DE LIPOPROTEINES DENATUREES, PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE MALADIES DU SYSTEME CIRCULATOIRE ET REACTIFS POUR LA DETECTION DE MALADIES DU SYSTEME CIRCULATOIRE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2004 | Translation filed | 11.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 02.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2010 | BE | 25.08.2010 | CY | 25.08.2010 | CZ | 25.08.2010 | DK | 25.08.2010 | EE | 25.08.2010 | FI | 25.08.2010 | IT | 25.08.2010 | NL | 25.08.2010 | SE | 25.08.2010 | SK | 25.08.2010 | TR | 25.08.2010 | BG | 25.11.2010 | GR | 26.11.2010 | ES | 06.12.2010 | PT | 27.12.2010 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 25.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0002046 (KAROLINSKA INNOVATIONS AB [SE], et al)[A] 1-9; | [X] - BRILES D E ET AL, "THE EFFECTS OF SUBCLASS ON THE ABILITY OF ANTI-PHOSPHOCHOLINE ANTIBODIES TO PROTECT MICE FROM FATAL INFECTION WITH STREPTOCOCCUS PNEUMONIAE", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1984), vol. 1, no. 5, ISSN 0724-6803, pages 305 - 309, XP009046984 [X] 10 * page 305 * | [X] - YOTHER J ET AL, "PROTECTION OF MICE FROM INFECTION WITH STREPTOCOCCUS PNEUMONIAE BY ANTI-PHOSPHOCHOLINE ANTIBODY", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY. WASHINGTON, US, (198204), vol. 36, no. 1, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 184 - 188, XP009047079 [X] 10 * page 184 * | International search | [A]JPH02216460 (NIPPON KOTAI KENKYUSHO KK); | [A]JPH08101195 (DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO LTD); | [X]JPH08228774 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD); | [X]JPH11125635 (AZWELL INC); | [A]JP2001066307 (IKAGAKU KK) |