EP1414644 - PACKAGING MATERIAL AND CONTAINERS FORMED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milliken & Company 920 Milliken Road Spartanburg, SC 29303 / US | [2004/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIPSON, Kyle, G. 106 Hatteras Lane Simpsonville, SC 29680 / US | 02 /
GODFREY, Thomas, E. 303 Pineview Drive Moore, SC 29369 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02746949.3 | 10.07.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002US21729 | Priority number, date | US20010310771P | 08.08.2001 Original published format: US 310771 P | US20020178417 | 24.06.2002 Original published format: US 178417 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03016049 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1414644 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
B65D29/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/52] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE BEHÄLTER | [2004/19] | English: | PACKAGING MATERIAL AND CONTAINERS FORMED THEREFROM | [2004/19] | French: | MATERIAU D'EMBALLAGE ET RECIPIENTS FORMES EN CE MATERIAU | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 09.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 11.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/36] | 13.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XT]US2002122926 (GOODSON RAYMOND L [US]) |