EP1413117 - AN AIRBORNE SECURITY MANAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago IL 60606-2016 / US | ||
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROCKWELL, Laurence, I. 1443 NE 61st. Street Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2004/24] |
Former [2004/18] | 01 /
ROCKWELL, Lawrence, I. 8018-146th Avenue NE Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Representative(s) | Lindner, Michael, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Lindner, Michael, Dipl.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02747074.9 | 19.07.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002US23226 | Priority number, date | US20010309862P | 03.08.2001 Original published format: US 309862 P | US20010992310 | 19.11.2001 Original published format: US 992310 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03014891 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1413117 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1413117 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
H04L63/1408 (EP,US);
B64D45/0015 (EP,US);
B64D45/0059 (EP,US);
G08B31/00 (EP,US);
H04W12/122 (EP,US);
H04W84/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/16] |
Former [2004/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN LUFTGESTÜTZTER SICHERHEITSMANAGER | [2004/18] | English: | AN AIRBORNE SECURITY MANAGER | [2004/18] | French: | GESTIONNAIRE DE SECURITE DE BORD | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 13.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Request for further processing for: | 08.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9957625 (PRC INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 3, lines 22-27 * * page 4, lines 1-19 * * page 5, lines 17-24 * * page 6, lines 15-22 * * page 8, lines 10-25 * * page 9, lines 1-3,17-26 * * page 11, lines 5-25 * * page 12, lines 19-29 * * page 13, lines 7-11,24-27 * * page 15, lines 3-5, paragraphs 23-25 * * page 16, lines 22-30 * * page 17, lines 1-22 * * page 19, lines 11-13,20-22 * * page 21, lines 6-17 *; | [Y]EP0890907 (ICO SERVICES LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,12,19 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 14 *; | [Y] - "AN INTRODUCTION TO INTRUSION DETECTION ASSESSMENT FOR SYSTEM AND NETWORK SECURITY MANAGEMENT, PASSAGE", INTRODUCTION TO INTRUSION DETECTION ASSESSMENT FOR SYSTEM AND NETWORK SECURITY MANAGEMENT, XX, XX, (1998), pages 1 - 38, XP002935681 [Y] 2-11,13-18 * page 11, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 28, paragraph 2 - page 29, paragraph 9 * |